Bastien v. B & G Roustabout Service, LLC
Plaintiff: Ashley Bastien
Defendant: B & G Roustabout Service, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Charles S Miller
3 Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Hearings Terminated. Jury Trial set for 6/2/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor is CANCELLED. Case settled. (rm)
April 15, 2020 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2020 is CANCELLED. (SR)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text Only) ORDER Re: Settlement by Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Closing documents due on or before June 29, 2020. (SR)
April 15, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Settlement by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC (Wissa, Michael)
April 8, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference REset for 4/16/2020 at 09:30 AM BY TELEPHONE before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (change as to location only - previously set for Courtroom 1)Chambers will host the call and will send instructions to the parties on how to connect to the conference call. (SR) Modified on 4/8/2020 to indicate reset language (am).
February 27, 2020 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel M. Traynor: Status Conference held on 2/27/2020. (Court Reporter None) (jr)
February 27, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial RESET for 6/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (previously set for 4/27/2020)(4 Days). Pretrial Conference RESET for 4/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (previously set for 4/13/2020). (CK) Modified on 2/28/2020 to add length of trial to entry (am).
February 25, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Chambers will initiate the call.(CK)
February 5, 2020 Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 (5 days) before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (change as to presiding judge only) (kmk)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 24 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Status Conference held on 11/6/2019. (JS)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter denying #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 20 Motion to Amend/Correct. (JS)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Scheduling Order,,, #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Deadlines in the Court's Scheduling Order filed by Ashley Bastien. (Frank, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed Motion to Amend/Correct at 20 . (am)
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Scheduling Order by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. See document #19 .(am)
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Deadlines in the Court's Scheduling Order by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. (Wissa, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation re #17 Stipulation filed by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(GD)
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Entry of Protective Order by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. (Jacob, Kyle)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 3/25/2019. (GD) Modified on 3/26/2019 to note that the minutes are a text only entry, NEF regenerated (lf).
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 (5 days) at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (GD)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.) by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GD)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Discovery Motions due by 10/31/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/31/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/31/2019. Expert Discovery due by 11/30/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 6/17/2019. Threshold Motions due by 4/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2020.(GD) Modified on 3/25/2019 to correct Magistrate Judge. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
March 21, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 STIPULATION (Scheduling/Discovery Plan). Should not have been filed in CM/ECF. Clerk's office restricted access to document. Pursuant to the Order at #11 the proposed plan should have been e-mailed to chambers in Word or WordPerfect format. (as)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 *RESTRICTED - SHOULD NOT BE FILED IN CM/ECF* STIPULATION Scheduling/Discovery Plan by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. (Jacob, Kyle) Modified on 3/27/2019 to restrict access. (as)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 11 replaced on 2/25/2019) to correct caption (am). NEF regenerated on 2/25/2019 (am).
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry W. Sledz, Jr on behalf of B & G Roustabout Service, LLC (Sledz, Henry)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle J. Jacob on behalf of B & G Roustabout Service, LLC (Jacob, Kyle)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint at Law by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC.(Ward, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Wissa on behalf of B & G Roustabout Service, LLC (Wissa, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case, as referral judge. (kmk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Bastien. B & G Roustabout Service, LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/22/2019 (Frank, Matthew)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. B & G Roustabout Service, LLC's answer due by 2/22/2019. (BG)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (unopposed) by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. (Ward, John)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. (cjs)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B & G Roustabout Service, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000417) filed by Ashley Bastien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bastien v. B & G Roustabout Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Bastien
Represented By: Steven A. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & G Roustabout Service, LLC
Represented By: Michael Wissa
Represented By: Kyle J. Jacob
Represented By: Patrick J. Ward
Represented By: Henry W. Sledz, Jr
Represented By: John E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?