Nietz v. B & G Roustabout Service, LLC

Plaintiff: Michele Nietz
Defendant: B & G Roustabout Service, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00006
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 15 replaced on 2/25/2019) to correct caption (am). NEF regenerated on 2/25/2019 (am).
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry W. Sledz, Jr on behalf of B & G Roustabout Service, LLC (Sledz, Henry)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle J. Jacob on behalf of B & G Roustabout Service, LLC (Jacob, Kyle)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint at Law, COUNTERCLAIM against Michele Nietz by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC.(Ward, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Wissa on behalf of B & G Roustabout Service, LLC (Wissa, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. (cjs)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Nietz. B & G Roustabout Service, LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/22/2019 (Frank, Matthew)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer B & G Roustabout Service, LLC answer due 2/22/2019. Previously due 1/29/2019. (GD)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/12/2019. (cjs)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (unopposed) by B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. (Ward, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Michele Nietz. (rh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to B & G Roustabout Service, LLC. (cjs)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Michele Nietz. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/22/2019. (cjs)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B & G Roustabout Service, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000418) filed by Michele Nietz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nietz v. B & G Roustabout Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Nietz
Represented By: Steven A. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & G Roustabout Service, LLC
Represented By: Michael Wissa
Represented By: Kyle J. Jacob
Represented By: Patrick J. Ward
Represented By: Henry W. Sledz, Jr
Represented By: John E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?