Demos v. U.S.A. et al
Plaintiff: John Robert Demos, Jr
Defendant: U.S., U.S. Attorney General, President of the U.S.A., Wash, D.C., U.S.A. and U.S. Congress
Case Number: 1:2019cv00020
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet re #12 Notice of Appeal mailed to John Robert Demos, Jr. (rh)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal. (rh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: PLRA APPEAL PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA appeal packet sent to inmate. (rh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, by John Robert Demos, Jr. Filing fee Not Paid. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
February 21, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (cjs)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot #2 Motion Motion for Relief from the 1-23-2019 Directive of the Clerk of Court; denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and dismissing case without prejudice. (BG) Distributed on 2/21/2019 (cjs).
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 PLRA Packet by John Robert Demos, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by John Robert Demos, Jr. (cjs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Mailing Envelope) (cjs).
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (kmk) Distributed on 2/8/2019. (rh)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to John Robert Demos, Jr. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/20/2019. (rh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Robert Demos, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Declaration to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #3 PLRA In Forma Pauperis Status Report, #4 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Review of a Constitutional Issue by John Robert Demos, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Relief from the 1/23/19 Directive of the Clerk of the Court by John Robert Demos, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demos v. U.S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President of the U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wash, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Demos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?