Hunter v. Bilfinger Westcon Inc.

Plaintiff: Denette Hunter
Defendant: Bilfinger Westcon Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00032
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Denette Hunter. (am)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Denette Hunter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/4/2019. (am)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bilfinger Westcon Inc.. (cjs)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Denette Hunter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/20/2019. (cjs)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bilfinger Westcon Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000541) filed by Denette Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Bilfinger Westcon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilfinger Westcon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denette Hunter
Represented By: Ryan R. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?