Sabot v. Pringle et al
Petitioner: Eric Lance Sabot
Respondent: Rosalie Etherington and Chad Pringle
Case Number: 1:2019cv00033
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Petition filed by Eric Lance Sabot. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Chad Pringle. (cjs)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Chad Pringle. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/17/2019. (as)
March 30, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Petition filed by Chad Pringle. (Mahoney, Michael)
March 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Petition by Chad Pringle. (Mahoney, Michael)
March 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) filed by Chad Pringle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Register of Actions, State v. Sabot, Burleigh County Case 08-2016-CR-01385, #2 Exhibit Information, State v. Sabot Case 08-2016-CR-01385, #3 Exhibit Transcript, Court Trial, State v. Sabot, Case 08-2016-CR-01385, #4 Exhibit Judgment of Conviction, State v. SabotCase 08-2016-CR-01385, #5 Exhibit Docket NDSC State v. Sabot, Supreme Court No. 20170100, #6 Exhibit Appellants Brief, State v. Sabot, Supreme Court No. 20170100, #7 Exhibit Appellees Brief, State v. Sabot, Supreme Court No. 20170100, #8 Exhibit Supplemental Brief, State v. Sabot, Supreme Court No. 20170100, #9 Exhibit State v. Sabot, 2017 ND 280, #10 Exhibit Register of Actions, Sabot v. State, Burleigh County Case 08-2018-CV-00315, #11 Exhibit Post-conviction Application, Sabot v. State, Burleigh County Case 08-2018-CV-00315, #12 Exhibit State's Response, Sabot v. State, Burleigh County Case 08-2018-CV-00315, #13 Exhibit State's Motion for Summary Disposition, Sabot v. State, Burleigh County Case 08-2018-CV-00315, #14 Exhibit Response to Motion, Sabot v. State, Burleigh County Case 08-2018-CV-00315, #15 Exhibit Order for Summary Disposition, Sabot v. State, Burleigh County Case 08-2018-CV-00315, #16 Exhibit Docket, NDSC, Sabot v. State, Supreme Court No. 20180191, #17 Exhibit Appellant's Brief, Sabot v. State, Supreme Court No. 20180191, #18 Exhibit Appellee's Brief, Sabot v. State, Supreme Court No. 20180191, #19 Exhibit Reply Brief, Sabot v. State, Supreme Court No. 20180191, #20 Exhibit Sabot v. State, 2018 ND 251, #21 Exhibit Declaration of Jessica L. Johnson)(Mahoney, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Eric Lance Sabot. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Order to Answer. Mail resent to Eric Lance Sabot at the Bismarck Transition Center. (rh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Notice of Direct Assignment. Mail resent to Eric Lance Sabot at the Bismarck Transition Center. (rh)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 2/12/2019 (cjs).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 2/12/2019 (cjs).
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Eric Lance Sabot. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/25/2019. (rh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Eric Lance Sabot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miscellaneous attachments, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to FBI (Missing page 16), #3 Exhibit 3 - Miscellaneous case law, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Eric Lance Sabot (8/14/18), #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Eric Lance Sabot (9/24/18), #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Lance Sabot. (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabot v. Pringle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rosalie Etherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Pringle
Represented By: Michael T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Lance Sabot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?