MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: Mandan, Hidatsa & Arikara Nation
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior and Ryan Zinke
Intervenor Defendant: Slawson Exploration Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00037
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #49 Notice of Change of Address. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Notice (Other) at #50 . Clerk's office also corrected filer. (cjs)
April 5, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME by Mandan, Hidatsa & Arikara Nation. (cjs)
April 5, 2019 Filing 49 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey S. Rasmussen (Rasmussen, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/8/2019 to restrict access (cjs).
March 26, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Amend/Correct #40 Order, by U.S. Department of the Interior. (McCune, Devon)
March 5, 2019 Filing 47 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by U.S. Department of the Interior. (am)
March 4, 2019 Filing 46 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Mandan, Hidatsa & Arikara Nation. (rh)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
March 4, 2019 Filing 44 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Slawson Exploration Company, Inc. (rh)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean C. Grimsley; granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. McElroy. (js)
February 26, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel R. McElroy (Filing fee $150, receipt number) by Slawson Exploration Company, Inc.. (McElroy, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sean C. Grimsley (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000614) by Slawson Exploration Company, Inc.. (Grimsley, Sean) Modified on 2/26/2019 to add receipt number (cjs).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Copy of the administrative record due by 3/29/2019. MHA's motion for summary judgment due by 4/29/2019. United States' and Slawson's motion/response to MHA's motion due by 5/27/2019. MHA's response/reply due by 6/28/2019.(BG)
February 19, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Slawson Exploration Company, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/5/2019. (lf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ryan Zinke. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/5/2019. (lf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to U.S. Department of the Interior. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/5/2019. (lf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mandan, Hidatsa & Arikara Nation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/5/2019. (lf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-01462. Original file, transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 2/19/2019 to remove certified language from the docket entry (lf).
February 15, 2019 Filing 34 Case transferred to the USDC for the North Dakota, pursuant to the Court Order entered 2/5/19. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd)
February 5, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (lsj)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Motion #18 to Transfer Case. Transfer due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/5/2019. (lccrc1) Modified on 2/5/2019 (zlsj).
January 7, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC.. Attorney Eric R. Olson terminated. (Goldberg, Richard)
November 1, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY to opposition to motion re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (McCune, Devon)
November 1, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY to opposition to motion re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U, #2 Exhibit V, #3 Exhibit W, #4 Exhibit X, #5 Exhibit Y, #6 Exhibit Z)(Goldberg, Richard)
October 22, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply Brief due by 11/1/2018. (lsj)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply briefs in support of the motion to transfer shall be due on or before November 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/22/2018. (lccrc1)
October 18, 2018 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Transfer Case by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCune, Devon)
October 16, 2018 Filing 28 ERRATA by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION #27 Memorandum in Opposition filed by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Hearing Calendar Honorable Daniel L. Hovland, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Transcript page re Halcon v. Rez Rock N Water, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Transcript page re Western Energy v USDOI)(Rasmussen, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2018 Filing 27 Memorandum in opposition to re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION. (Rasmussen, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2018 ***Attorney Jeffrey S. Rasmussen for MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION added. (lsj)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #25 Motion for Admission of Attorney Jeffrey S. Rasmussen Pro Hac Vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/2/2018. (lccrc1)
September 27, 2018 Motions terminated: #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION. (lsj)
September 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Transfer Venue due by 10/15/2018 (lsj)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions to Transfer Venue. Plaintiff shall file its response by October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/26/2018. (lccrc1)
September 26, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE THAT MOTION TO EXTEND (DKT. 24) IS UNOPPOSED by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION (Wilson, Rollie)
September 26, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey S. Rasmussen, :Firm- Fredericks Peebles & Morgan LLP, :Address- 1900 Plaza Drive, Louisville, CO 80027. Phone No. - (303) 673-9600. Fax No. - (303) 673-9155 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5706922. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey S. Rasmussen in Support of Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JEFFREY S. RASMUSSEN)(Wilson, Rollie)
September 26, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Transfer Case by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Rollie)
September 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Transfer Case due by 10/1/2018 (lsj)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #21 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Transfer Case, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is granted. Plaintiff's response is due by October 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/18/2018. (lccrc1)
September 17, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case and Joinder in Motion to Transfer filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (McCune, Devon)
September 17, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE.(McCune, Devon)
September 12, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Transfer Case by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Rollie)
September 11, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McElroy on behalf of SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. (McElroy, Daniel)
September 11, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Olson on behalf of SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. (Olson, Eric)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T)(Goldberg, Richard)
August 29, 2018 ***Attorneys Eric R. Olson and Daniel McElroy for SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. added. (lsj)
August 29, 2018 *** Attorneys Daniel McElroy and Eric R. Olson terminated as counsel for Defendant. Entered in error. (lsj)
August 29, 2018 ***Attorneys Eric R. Olson and Daniel McElroy for U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR added. (lsj)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Intervenor Defendant's #14 Motion for Admission of Attorney Eric R. Olson Pro Hac Vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/29/2018. (lccrc1)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Intervenor Defendant's #13 Motion for Admission of Attorney Daniel McElroy Pro Hac Vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/29/2018. (lccrc1)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/29/2018. (lccrc1)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 ERRATA by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. #14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric R. Olson, :Firm- BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP, :Address- 1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 800, Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - (303) 592-3100. Fax No. - (303) 592-3140 filed by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Goldberg, Richard)
August 27, 2018 Filing 15 ERRATA by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. #13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel McElroy, :Firm- BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP, :Address- 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300, Chicago, IL 60654. Phone No. - (312) 494-4400. Fax No. - (312) 494- filed by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Goldberg, Richard)
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric R. Olson, :Firm- BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP, :Address- 1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 800, Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - (303) 592-3100. Fax No. - (303) 592-3140 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5659234. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Richard)
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel McElroy, :Firm- BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP, :Address- 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300, Chicago, IL 60654. Phone No. - (312) 494-4400. Fax No. - (312) 494-4400 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5659223. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Richard)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC.. (Goldberg, Richard)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Paul Goldberg on behalf of SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goldberg, Richard)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by SLAWSON EXPLORATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Answer of Defendant-Intervenor, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q)(Goldberg, Richard)
August 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answer due by 9/17/2018 (lsj)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' answer or other response is due by September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/24/2018. (lccrc1)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCune, Devon)
July 9, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/28/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/27/2018. (Wilson, Rollie)
July 9, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/29/2018. (Wilson, Rollie)
July 9, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RYAN ZINKE served on 6/27/2018 (Wilson, Rollie)
July 9, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 6/27/2018 (Wilson, Rollie)
July 9, 2018 Filing 4 ERRATA by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION #1 Complaint, filed by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION. (Attachments: #1 Errata Attachment A)(Wilson, Rollie)
June 22, 2018 Filing 3 ERRATA by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION #1 Complaint, filed by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION. (Attachments: #1 Errata Corrected Caption Page)(Wilson, Rollie)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
June 20, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsth)
June 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5545919) filed by MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Department of the Interior, #3 Summons Ryan Zinke, #4 Summons Jefferson B Sessions/US Department of Justice, #5 Summons Jessie K. Liu/US Attorney)(Wilson, Rollie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/21/2018) (zsth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANDAN, HIDATSA AND ARIKARA NATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Devon L. McCune
Represented By: Eric Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Devon L. McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandan, Hidatsa & Arikara Nation
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Slawson Exploration Company, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Olson
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Daniel R. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?