Mead et al v. North Range Resources, LLC

Plaintiff: Jessica Mead, Justin Mead, Melissa Ann Mead and David F. Mead
Defendant: North Range Resources, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00041
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand filed by David F. Mead, Jessica Mead, Justin Mead, Melissa Ann Mead. (Ficek, Vince) Modified on 4/23/2019 to remove excess docket text. (am).
April 8, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph J. Barile re #24 Response to Motion by North Range Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - IRS Letter)(Huckfeldt, Christina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand filed by North Range Resources, LLC. (Huckfeldt, Christina)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
March 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 9/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Trial Est. 4 Days). (AS)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. The court will initiate the call. (AS)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Discovery Motions due by 12/20/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/4/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/24/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 8/28/2019. Threshold Motions due by 9/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020. (AS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 3/29/2019. (lc)
March 28, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #15 AFFIDAVIT. Duplicate Entry. See Document #16 (with attached exhibit). Clerk's office restricted access to document. DOCKET CORRECTION re: #16 AFFIDAVIT. Clerk's office added description to exhibit pursuant to this Court's Administrative Policy. (as)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 3/29/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Previously set before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.) (BG) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add previously set language. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Vince H. Ficek re: #13 MOTION to Remand by David F. Mead, Jessica Mead, Justin Mead, Melissa Ann Mead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Letter from Lawrence Bender to Mr. Ficek, dated 10/2/18)(Ficek, Vince) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add description to exhibit and correct link. (as)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 *RESTRICTED - DUPLICATE ENTRY - SEE #16 * AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Vince H. Ficek in Support of Motion to Remand re #14 MEMORANDUM in Support by David F. Mead, Jessica Mead, Justin Mead, Melissa Ann Mead. (Ficek, Vince) Modified on 3/28/2019 to restrict access. (as)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand filed by David F. Mead, Jessica Mead, Justin Mead, Melissa Ann Mead. (Ficek, Vince)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand by David F. Mead, Jessica Mead, Justin Mead, Melissa Ann Mead. (Ficek, Vince)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by David F. Mead, Jessica Mead, Justin Mead, Melissa Ann Mead. (am)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by North Range Resources, LLC. (cjs)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Melissa Ann Mead. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/19/2019. (am) Distributed on 3/5/2019 (am).
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Justin Mead. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/19/2019. (am)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jessica Mead. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/19/2019. (am) Distributed on 3/5/2019 (am).
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to David F. Mead. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/19/2019. (am) Distributed on 3/5/2019 (am).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 3/5/2019 (am).
March 5, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 ANSWER. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) at #5 . (js)
March 5, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment. Filed in error. Clerks office restricted access to document. (js)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to North Range Resources, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/19/2019. (js) Modified on 3/5/2019 to restrict filing. (js)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by North Range Resources, LLC. (js)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ANSWER to Complaint by North Range Resources, LLC.(Bender, Lawrence) Modified on 3/5/2019 to restrict access. (js)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to North Range Resources, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/11/2019. (am)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Range Resources, LLC from McKenzie County District Court, case number 27-2019-CV-00082. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 119000612 filed by North Range Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Service)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mead et al v. North Range Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Mead
Represented By: Mary Kristeen Hand
Represented By: Vince H Ficek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Mead
Represented By: Mary Kristeen Hand
Represented By: Vince H Ficek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Ann Mead
Represented By: Mary Kristeen Hand
Represented By: Vince H Ficek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David F. Mead
Represented By: Mary Kristeen Hand
Represented By: Vince H Ficek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Range Resources, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?