Follmer v. Lyson
Plaintiff: Chad Follmer
Defendant: Derek Lyson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00044
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Derek Lyson.(Vendsel, Jason)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(am)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Derek Lyson. (am)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Derek Lyson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/24/2019. (as)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Vendsel on behalf of Derek Lyson (Vendsel, Jason)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Chad Follmer. (cjs)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Chad Follmer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/13/2019. (cjs)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Derek Lyson. (cjs)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Derek Lyson (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000620) filed by Chad Follmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Follmer v. Lyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Lyson
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Follmer
Represented By: Tyler Johnson Siewert
Represented By: Meggi Ihland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?