Kuntz v. Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv00070
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter recused. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 7/22/2019 (am).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration. (BG) Distributed on 6/18/2019. (rh)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Insofar as the 11 Objection filed by Riley S. Kuntz could be construed as a request for reconsideration of the court's order of 5/23/2019, it is denied. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 6/3/2019 (cjs).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 8 MOTION to Set Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Department of Justice shall have 6/24/2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuntz v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?