SunBehm Gas, Inc. v. Equinor Energy, LP

Plaintiff: SunBehm Gas, Inc.
Defendant: Equinor Energy, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00094
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Reply due by 8/5/2019. (BG)
July 29, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #16 Memorandum in Support. Clerk's Office linked to correct document. (cjs)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Equinor Energy, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Brief)(Huckfeldt, Christina) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct/remove links and remove excess docket text cjs).
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Equinor Energy, LP. (Huckfeldt, Christina) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct link(cjs).
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SunBehm Gas, Inc. See Attachment 1 to Document #12 . (rh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Hearing by SunBehm Gas, Inc. See Document #12 . (rh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by SunBehm Gas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Leonard E. Behm)(Lautt, Steven)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response due by 7/15/2019. (BG)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SunBehm Gas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation for Extension)(Lautt, Steven)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by SunBehm Gas, Inc.. (cjs)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to SunBehm Gas, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/1/2019. (cjs)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Equinor Energy, LP. (cjs)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Equinor Energy, LP. (Bender, Lawrence)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Equinor Energy, LP. (Bender, Lawrence)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to SunBehm Gas, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/17/2019. (am)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Equinor Energy, LP. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/17/2019. (am)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Lawrence Bender re #1 Notice of Removal by Equinor Energy, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated March 20, 2018)(am)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equinor Energy, LP from McKenzie County District Court, case number Unknown. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 119001030. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SunBehm Gas, Inc. v. Equinor Energy, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SunBehm Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Lautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinor Energy, LP
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?