Moore v. Target Logistics Management

Plaintiff: Stephanie H. Moore
Defendant: Target Logistics Management
Case Number: 1:2019cv00101
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephanie H. Moore (Per USPS, item was served 6/7/19) (rh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Stephanie H. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Target Logistics Management (IFP granted) filed by Stephanie H. Moore.(cjs)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (GD) Distributed on 6/12/2019 (cjs).
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Stephanie H. Moore. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/25/2019. (rh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephanie H. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (blank), #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Mailing Envelope)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Target Logistics Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Logistics Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie H. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?