Washington v. McLean County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Washington
Defendant: McLean County Jail and Reliance Telephone Systems
Case Number: 1:2019cv00124
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Anthony M. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against McLean County Jail, Reliance Telephone Systems filed by Anthony M. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(am)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to McLean County Jail and Anthony M. Washington re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (am)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 6/25/2019 (am).
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Anthony M. Washington. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/5/2019. (cjs)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service, #3 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony M. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. McLean County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLean County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Telephone Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?