American Medical Association et al v. Stenehjem et al
Plaintiff: Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association and Kathryn L. Eggleston, M.D.
Defendant: Wayne Stenehjem and Birch Burdick
Petitioner: David Billings, M.D., Women's Pregnancy Center, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), Eric Pearson, M.D., North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent and Dakota Hope Clinic
Case Number: 1:2019cv00125
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT Cassidy re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit unpublished opinion, #2 Exhibit brochure)(Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT Kiefer re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT Ruch re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT Schott re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT Cota re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT Godsey re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT Glessner re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT Carson re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT Breen re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT Murphy re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit list of physicians)(Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT Pearson re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT Chandler re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #72 AFFIDAVIT. Error in document. Clerk's office restricted access to document per request of filer. (am)
August 23, 2019 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT Billings re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT Smetana re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 72 *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* AFFIDAVIT Smetana re #54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access(am).
August 23, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #55 MOTION to Intervene. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document, re-filed as MEMORANDUM in Support at #71 , and separated attachment from main document. Re: #56 , #57 , #58 , #59 , #60 , #61 , #62 , #63 , #64 , #65 , #66 , #67 , #68 , #69 MOTION to Intervene. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to documents and informed filer per telephone that documents need to be re-filed. Re: #70 ANSWER. Filed in error. Should have been filed as an attachment to Motion. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as attachment to MOTION to Intervene at #54 . (am)
August 22, 2019 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Support re #54 MOTION to Intervene filed by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Attachments: #1 Planned Parenthood Minn, N.D., S.D. et al v. Alpha Center, 213 Fed Appx. 508 (2007))(am)
August 22, 2019 Filing 70 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* ANSWER to Complaint by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center.(Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 69 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 68 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 67 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 66 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 65 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 64 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 63 * RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 62 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 61 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 60 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 59 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 58 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 57 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 56 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 55 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 8/23/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 22, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Intervene by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (Cassidy, Harold) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Proposed Answer) (am). NEF regenerated on 8/23/2019 (am).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 22, 2019 Filing 52 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 2/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days) (amended to correct trial judge) (BG)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 4/20/2020. Discovery Motions due by 4/27/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/1/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/22/2020. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/13/2020. Sur Rebbutal Expert Disclosures due by 7/20/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 9/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2020. (BG) (Main Document 50 replaced on 8/22/2019 to correct time of mid-discovery status conference) (cjs). Regenerated on 8/22/2019 (cjs).
August 22, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 2/1/2021 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 22, 2019 Filing 48 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2019. (BG)
August 20, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #44 REPLY to RESPONSE to Motion. Modified entry to remove duplicate 'exhibit' text; #45 NOTICE. Modified entry to remove duplicate 'exhibit' text. (js)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #46 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Harold J. Cassidy. (cjs)
August 16, 2019 Filing 46 AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Harold J. Cassidy (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001249) by David Billings, MD, Dakota Hope Clinic, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.), North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Eric Pearson, MD, Women's Pregnancy Center. (cjs)
July 31, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by Wayne Stenehjem re #36 Response to Motion,, Notice of Errata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3A - Obritsch CV)(Titus, Courtney) Modified on 8/20/2019 to remove duplicate exhibit text(js).
July 31, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Supplemental Declaration of Courtney Schreiber, M.D.)(Alexander, Lauren) Modified on 8/20/2019 to remove duplicate exhibit text (js).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #41 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (BG)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 30, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Alexander, Lauren)
July 30, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Modified entry to add filers Dakota Hope Clinic, Women's Pregnancy Center, and National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.). (am)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Harold J. Cassidy. (am)
July 30, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Harold J. Cassidy (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001249) by North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent, Dakota Hope Clinic, Women's Pregnancy Center, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.). (Cassidy, Harold) Modified on 7/30/2019 to add filers and receipt number (am).
July 26, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer by Wayne Stenehjem.(Titus, Courtney)
July 26, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Birch Burdick.(Porsborg, Scott)
July 19, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction State of North Dakota's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wayne Stenehjem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - House Bill No. 1336, #2 Exhibit 2 - Legislative History of H.B. 1336, #3 Exhibit 3 - Obritsch Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3A - Obritsch CV, #5 Exhibit 3B - Obritsch Testimony, #6 Exhibit 4 - Vetter Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4A - Vetter CV)(Anderson, Douglas) Modified on 7/29/2019 to remove duplicate text. (as)
July 19, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Birch Burdick. (Porsborg, Scott)
July 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Birch Burdick answer due 7/26/2019; Wayne Stenehjem answer due 7/26/2019. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .( Responses due by 7/19/2019, Replies due by 7/31/2019.) (rh)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Adopting #33 Stipulation by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (CM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation by Wayne Stenehjem. (Anderson, Douglas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland: Status Conference held on 7/10/2019. (Court Reporter SE) (jr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 08:30 AM by telephone before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Please call in per instructions in separate email. (CM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland: Status Conference held on 7/8/2019. (Court Reporter SE) (jr)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin Sutton; granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Leonard Nelson; granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian Vandenberg. (js)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Birch Burdick answer due 7/17/2019. (cjs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott K. Porsborg on behalf of Birch Burdick (Porsborg, Scott)
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000389) by American Medical Association. (Vandenberg, Brian) Modified on 7/1/2019 to add receipt number (lh).
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000388) by American Medical Association. (Nelson, Leonard) Modified on 7/1/2019 to add receipt number (lh).
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000387) by American Medical Association. (Sutton, Erin) Modified on 7/1/2019 to add receipt number (lh).
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD, American Medical Association, Access Independent Health Services, Inc.. Birch Burdick served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019 (Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 7/1/2019 to correct service date and answer due date(cjs).
June 27, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 AFFIDAVIT of Tammi Kromenaker; #17 AFFIDAVIT of James Madara. Duplicate pleading, see #6 . Clerk's office restricted access to documents. (am) Modified on 7/10/2019 to correct link from doc. 12 to 13. (rm)
June 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 01:00 PM by telephone before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (CM)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Status Conference and Briefing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (CM)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Molly R. Duane. (cjs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Rebecca Titus on behalf of Wayne Stenehjem (Titus, Courtney)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Brian Wildey - Exhibit 6 re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wildey CV)(Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add exhibit language (am).
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew Wynia - Exhibit 5 re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wynia CV)(Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add exhibit language (am).
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 *RESTRICTED-DUPLICATE PLEADING FILED, SEE DOCUMENT #6 * AFFIDAVIT of James Madara re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 6/27/2019 to restrict access (am).
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Courtney Schreiber - Exhibit 3 re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schreiber CV, #2 Exhibit B - Delgado and Davenport article, #3 Exhibit C - Delgado, Davenport, et al. article, #4 Exhibit D - ACOG Statement, #5 Exhibit E - Contraception article, #6 Exhibit F - NE Journal of Medicine article)(Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add exhibit language (am).
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas B. Anderson on behalf of Wayne Stenehjem (Anderson, Douglas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Kathryn Eggleston - Exhibit 2 re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eggleston CV, #2 Exhibit B - ACOG Public Statement)(Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add exhibit language. (am)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 *RESTRICTED-DUPLICATE PLEADING FILED, SEE DOCUMENT #6 * AFFIDAVIT of Tammi Kromenaker re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 6/27/2019 to restrict access (am).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Autumn Katz. (am)
June 26, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 Summons Returned Executed. Clerk's Office added filers Access Independent Health Services, Inc. and Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (cjs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 E-Filing Modification Request re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (cjs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Autumn Katz (Filing fee $150, receipt number #119001119) by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Katz, Autumn) Modified on 6/26/2019 to add receipt number (am).
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Sagsveen on behalf of Wayne Stenehjem (Sagsveen, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc Hearron. (cjs)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Medical Association, Access Independent Health Services, Inc., Kathryn L. Eggleston, M.D. Wayne Stenehjem served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 (Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 6/26/2019 to add filers (cjs).
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Kromenaker Declaration, #3 *RESTRICTED-EXHIBITS SHOULD HAVE BEEN SEPARATED FROM AFFIDAVIT* Exhibit 2 - Eggleston Declaration, #4 *RESTRICTED-EXHIBITS SHOULD HAVE BEEN SEPARATED FROM AFFIDAVIT* Exhibit 3 - Schreiber Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 - Madara Declaration, #6 *RESTRICTED-EXHIBITS SHOULD HAVE BEEN SEPARATED FRM AFFIDAVIT* Exhibit 5 - Wynia Declaration, #7 *RESTRICTED-EXHIBITS SHOUULD HAVE BEEN SEPARATED FROM AFFIDAVIT* Exhibit 6 - Wildey Declaration)(Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 6/26/2019 to restrict access to Exhibits 2, 3, 5 and 6 (cjs).
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc Hearron (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001115) by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Hearron, Marc) Modified on 6/25/2019 to add receipt number and attorney's name (cjs).
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Molly R. Duane (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001114) by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association, Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD. (Duane, Molly) Modified on 6/25/2019 to add receipt number and attorney's name (cjs).
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Access Independent Health Services, Inc., American Medical Association (no parent corporations). (cjs)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Birch Burdick, Wayne Stenehjem. (cjs)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Birch Burdick, Wayne Stenehjem (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001113) filed by Kathryn L. Eggleston, MD, American Medical Association, Access Independent Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - HB 1336, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Medical Association et al v. Stenehjem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Stenehjem
Represented By: Courtney Rebecca Titus
Represented By: Douglas B. Anderson
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birch Burdick
Represented By: Scott K. Porsborg
Represented By: Austin T. Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Access Independent Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Marc A Hearron
Represented By: Lauren Z. Alexander
Represented By: Benjamin Marks
Represented By: Steven Alan Reiss
Represented By: Molly Rose Duane
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Represented By: Autumn Chandra Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Medical Association
Represented By: Marc A Hearron
Represented By: Lauren Z. Alexander
Represented By: Benjamin Marks
Represented By: Steven Alan Reiss
Represented By: Molly Rose Duane
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Represented By: Leonard Nelson
Represented By: Brian Vandenberg
Represented By: Erin Sutton
Represented By: Autumn Chandra Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn L. Eggleston, M.D.
Represented By: Marc A Hearron
Represented By: Lauren Z. Alexander
Represented By: Benjamin Marks
Represented By: Steven Alan Reiss
Represented By: Molly Rose Duane
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Represented By: Autumn Chandra Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Billings, M.D.
Represented By: Harold Cassidy
Represented By: Donald R. Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Women's Pregnancy Center
Represented By: Harold Cassidy
Represented By: Donald R. Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (N.I.F.L.A.)
Represented By: Harold Cassidy
Represented By: Donald R. Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Pearson, M.D.
Represented By: Harold Cassidy
Represented By: Donald R. Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: North Dakota Physicians for Truth and Accuracy for Informed Consent
Represented By: Harold Cassidy
Represented By: Donald R. Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dakota Hope Clinic
Represented By: Harold Cassidy
Represented By: Donald R. Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?