Lund et al v. Big Butte Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: John Lund and Cozette Arvidson
Defendant: Big Butte Services, LLC and Linda Bone
Case Number: 1:2019cv00133
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim #7 by Cozette Arvidson, John Lund.(Welmaker, Douglas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Cozette Arvidson, John Lund.(Welmaker, Douglas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big Butte Services, LLC. (Weber, Aaron)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Linda Bone, Big Butte Services, LLC.(Weber, Aaron)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Cozette Arvidson, John Lund. (rh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to John Lund. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/17/2019. (am)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Cozette Arvidson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/17/2019. (am)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Big Butte Services, LLC, Linda Bone. (am)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big Butte Services, LLC, Linda Bone (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001144) filed by John Lund, Cozette Arvidson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lund et al v. Big Butte Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lund
Represented By: Douglas B Welmaker
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cozette Arvidson
Represented By: Douglas B Welmaker
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Butte Services, LLC
Represented By: Aaron J. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Bone
Represented By: Aaron J. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?