Chase et al v. Andeavor Logistics, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: JoAnn Chase, Mavis Huber, Jamie Lawrence, Monique Pleets, Nelson Fredericks, Linda Kroupa, Rae Ann Williams, Arnold Young Bird, Roger Bird Bear, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Albert Whitman, Anthony White Owl, Gloria Fast Dog, Donovan Fast Dog, Thomas Bird Bear, Doreen Charging, Eugene White Owl, Margo Bean, Tiffany Williams, Valeri Hosie, Noreen Young Bird, Kathleen White Owl, Wilson White Owl, Heather Demaray, Joan Matthews, Murphy Young Bird, Denise Cavanaugh, Josephine Parenteau, Sheridan Matthews, Joan Young Bird, Evelyn Lone Bear, Marion Rasmuson, Darryl Turner, Inez Burr, George Fast Dog, Karen Koite, Darlene Edley, Sharon Aubol, Deborah Staples, Janet Benton, Herbert Pleets, Betty Young Bird, Waylon Young Bird, Joyce Eakin, Sandra Gillette, Betty Matthews, Amanda Bird Bear and Eunice White Owl
Defendant: Tesoro Companies, Inc., Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC and Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00143
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re #73 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended) Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by JoAnn Chase. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix)(Harper, Keith)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #82 Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, and to Enlarge Page Limit. (BG)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #82 Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Response. Plaintiffs may file a consolidated response as outlined in their motion. (NH)
September 4, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File a Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, and to Enlarge Page Limit by JoAnn Chase. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plts' Consolidated Response to Defs' Motion to Dismiss)(Harper, Keith)
August 29, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Michael Harper on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harper, Keith)
August 29, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin T. Greene on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Greene, Dustin)
August 9, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #78 SUPPLEMENT. Clerk's office added link. Re: #79 SUPPLEMENT. Duplicate filing. Clerk's office restricted access. See document at #78 . (am)
August 8, 2019 Filing 79 *RESTRICTED - DUPLICATE FILING - SEE #78 * SUPPLEMENT Ex. A (2/12/19 Letter from Kilpatrick Townsend to Bureau of Indian Affairs) to document: #77 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2019 to restrict access (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 78 SUPPLEMENT (Ex. A - 2/12/19 Letter from Kilpatrick Townsend to Bureau of Indian Affairs) to document: #76 MEMORANDUM in Support and #77 MEMORANDUM in Support by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2019 to add link (am).
August 8, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #74 Memorandum in Support. Clerk's office removed link. Re: #76 Memorandum in Support. Exhibit not attached. Clerk's office restricted access to attachment. Re: #77 Memorandum in Support. Exhibit not attached. Clerk's office restricted access to attachment. (rh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Support re #73 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended) (Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies) filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 *RESTRICTED - DOCUMENT NOT ATTACHED* Exhibit A to #77 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies))(Webb, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/8/2019 to restrict attachment 1. (rh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM in Support re #73 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended) (Failure to Join Required Party) filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 *RESTRICTED - DOCUMENT NOT ATTACHED* Exhibit A to #76 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Failure to Join Required Party))(Webb, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/8/2019 to restrict attachment. (rh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Support re #73 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended) (12(b)(6) Failure to State a Claim) filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Support re #73 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended) (Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/8/2019 to remove link. (rh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended) by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P Steed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steed, Jason)
August 2, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Matthew Anstey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Anstey, Stephen)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re #69 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss and related briefing schedule. Amended Motion to Dismiss due by 8/7/2019. Response due by 9/4/2019. Reply due by 10/2/2019. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss (and related briefing schedule) by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 68 Case transferred in from Western District of Texas, Case Number 5:18-cv-01050. Original file, Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/12/2019 to correct file date. NEF regenerated. (rm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Transfer Case; DENYING #32 Motion to Certify Class; DENYING AS MOOT #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; DENYING #43 Motion to Amend/Correct; DENYING AS MOOT #48 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
June 25, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE Jeffrey A. Webb Vacation Letter for July 2019 by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P. (Webb, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2019 Filing 65 Memorandum in Support of #43 MOTION to Dismiss by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (aej)
May 6, 2019 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC, re #43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Andeavor, Defendant Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Defendant Tesoro Companies, Inc., Defendant Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Defendant Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC (aej)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #62 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
April 26, 2019 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC, re #43 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Andeavor, Defendant Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Defendant Tesoro Companies, Inc., Defendant Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Defendant Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC (Webb, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Reply Memorandum by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Webb, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC, re #43 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Andeavor, Defendant Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Defendant Tesoro Companies, Inc., Defendant Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Defendant Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC (Webb, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/29/2019 (aej).
April 26, 2019 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Reply Memorandum by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion)(Webb, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Sharon Aubol, Margo Bean, Janet Benton, Amanda Bird Bear, Roger Bird Bear, Thomas Bird Bear, Inez Burr, Denise Cavanaugh, Doreen Charging, JoAnn Chase, Heather Demaray, Joyce Eakin, Darlene Edley, Estate of Nelson Fredericks, Donovan Fast Dog, George Fast Dog, Gloria Fast Dog, Sandra Gillette, Valeri Hosie, Mavis Huber, Karen Koite, Linda Kroupa, Jamie Lawrence, Evelyn Lone Bear, Betty Matthews, Joan Matthews, Sheridan Matthews, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Josephine Parenteau, Herbert Pleets, Monique Pleets, Marion Rasmuson, Deborah Staples, Darryl Turner, Anthony White Owl, Eugene White Owl, Eunice White Owl, Kathleen White Owl, Wilson White Owl, Albert Whitman, Rae Ann Williams, Tiffany Williams, Arnold Young Bird, Betty Young Bird, Joan Young Bird, Murphy Young Bird, Noreen Young Bird, Waylon Young Bird, re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Andeavor, Defendant Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Defendant Tesoro Companies, Inc., Defendant Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Defendant Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC (aej)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #58 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and Consolidate Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
April 2, 2019 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and Consolidate Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by JoAnn Chase. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Harper, Keith)
March 25, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC, re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of North Dakota filed by Defendant Andeavor, Defendant Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Defendant Tesoro Companies, Inc., Defendant Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Defendant Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC (aej)
March 25, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Sharon Aubol, Margo Bean, Janet Benton, Amanda Bird Bear, Roger Bird Bear, Thomas Bird Bear, Inez Burr, Denise Cavanaugh, Doreen Charging, JoAnn Chase, Heather Demaray, Joyce Eakin, Darlene Edley, Estate of Nelson Fredericks, Donovan Fast Dog, George Fast Dog, Gloria Fast Dog, Sandra Gillette, Valeri Hosie, Mavis Huber, Karen Koite, Linda Kroupa, Jamie Lawrence, Evelyn Lone Bear, Betty Matthews, Joan Matthews, Sheridan Matthews, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Josephine Parenteau, Herbert Pleets, Monique Pleets, Marion Rasmuson, Deborah Staples, Darryl Turner, Anthony White Owl, Eugene White Owl, Eunice White Owl, Kathleen White Owl, Wilson White Owl, Albert Whitman, Rae Ann Williams, Tiffany Williams, Arnold Young Bird, Betty Young Bird, Joan Young Bird, Murphy Young Bird, Noreen Young Bird, Waylon Young Bird, re #42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION to Certify Class , to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel filed by Defendant Andeavor, Defendant Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Defendant Tesoro Companies, Inc., Defendant Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Defendant Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC (aej)
March 25, 2019 Filing 55 Amended Memorandum in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (aej)
March 25, 2019 Filing 54 Amended Memorandum in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (aej)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #53 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
March 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/29/2019 (aej)
March 22, 2019 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Reply Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Memorandum in Supp of [Dkt 22] Mot to Transfer Venue to North Dakota, #2 Proposed Order on #53 Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Page Limit)(Webb, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #49 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #46 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #44 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #17 Motion to Dismiss in light of Defendants filing an amended motion to dismiss #43 . entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline to file a proposed scheduling order is March 29, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
March 15, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by JoAnn Chase, re #48 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Alternative Motion for Venue Discovery filed by Plaintiff JoAnn Chase (Harper, Keith)
March 13, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC, re #49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff JoAnn Chase [Dkt. 49-1] (Webb, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2019 Filing 50 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC, re #48 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Alternative Motion for Venue Discovery filed by Plaintiff JoAnn Chase (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Webb, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Extension of Time by JoAnn Chase. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Extension of Time, #2 Proposed Order)(Harper, Keith)
March 1, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Alternative Motion for Venue Discovery by JoAnn Chase. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 Requests for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit 2 Notice of Deposition of James Sanford, #4 Proposed Order)(Harper, Keith)
March 1, 2019 Filing 47 Memorandum in Support, filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC, re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Andeavor, Defendant Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Defendant Tesoro Companies, Inc., Defendant Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Defendant Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC Amended (Failure to Exhause Admin. Remedies and Lack of Primary Jurisdiction) (Webb, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2019 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation as to Defs' Am Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Failure to Joint Party) by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support (Amended) in Supp of Defs' Motion to Dismiss (Failure to Joint Party), #2 Proposed Order on #46 Unopp Motion to Enlarge Pg Limit))(Webb, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2019 Filing 45 Memorandum in Support, filed by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC, re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Andeavor, Defendant Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Defendant Tesoro Companies, Inc., Defendant Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Defendant Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC Amended (Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted) (Webb, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2019 Filing 44 Amended MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation as to Am Memo in Support of Mot to Dismiss for Lack of Subj Matter Jurisdiction #44 by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Mot to Dismiss (Lack of Subj Matter Jurisdiction), #2 Proposed Order on Uopp Mot to Enlarge Page Limit as to #44 )(Webb, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2019 Filing 43 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #32 MOTION to Certify Class , to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aej)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #41 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
February 27, 2019 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order on Defs Opp Mot for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Class Cert Motion, #3 Proposed Order on Upposed Mot to Enlarge Page Limit)(Webb, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Sharon Aubol, Margo Bean, Janet Benton, Amanda Bird Bear, Roger Bird Bear, Thomas Bird Bear, Inez Burr, Denise Cavanaugh, Doreen Charging, JoAnn Chase, Heather Demaray, Joyce Eakin, Darlene Edley, Estate of Nelson Fredericks, Donovan Fast Dog, George Fast Dog, Gloria Fast Dog, Sandra Gillette, Valeri Hosie, Mavis Huber, Karen Koite, Linda Kroupa, Jamie Lawrence, Evelyn Lone Bear, Betty Matthews, Joan Matthews, Sheridan Matthews, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Josephine Parenteau, Herbert Pleets, Monique Pleets, Marion Rasmuson, Deborah Staples, Darryl Turner, Anthony White Owl, Eugene White Owl, Eunice White Owl, Kathleen White Owl, Wilson White Owl, Albert Whitman, Rae Ann Williams, Tiffany Williams, Arnold Young Bird, Betty Young Bird, Joan Young Bird, Murphy Young Bird, Noreen Young Bird, Waylon Young Bird, re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of North Dakota filed by Defendant Andeavor, Defendant Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Defendant Tesoro Companies, Inc., Defendant Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Defendant Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H-P, #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibit Q-X)(aej)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #39 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
February 22, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Sharon Aubol, Margo Bean, Janet Benton, Amanda Bird Bear, Roger Bird Bear, Thomas Bird Bear, Inez Burr, Denise Cavanaugh, Doreen Charging, JoAnn Chase, Heather Demaray, Joyce Eakin, Darlene Edley, Estate of Nelson Fredericks, Donovan Fast Dog, George Fast Dog, Gloria Fast Dog, Sandra Gillette, Valeri Hosie, Mavis Huber, Karen Koite, Linda Kroupa, Jamie Lawrence, Evelyn Lone Bear, Betty Matthews, Joan Matthews, Sheridan Matthews, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Josephine Parenteau, Herbert Pleets, Monique Pleets, Marion Rasmuson, Deborah Staples, Darryl Turner, Anthony White Owl, Eugene White Owl, Eunice White Owl, Kathleen White Owl, Wilson White Owl, Albert Whitman, Rae Ann Williams, Tiffany Williams, Arnold Young Bird, Betty Young Bird, Joan Young Bird, Murphy Young Bird, Noreen Young Bird, Waylon Young Bird. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Appendix Exhibits A-G, #2 Appendix Exhibits H-P, #3 Appendix Exhibit Q, #4 Appendix Exhibit Q-X, #5 Proposed Order)(Harper, Keith)
February 22, 2019 Filing 38 Memorandum in Support of #32 MOTION to Certify Class , to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel by Sharon Aubol, Margo Bean, Janet Benton, Amanda Bird Bear, Roger Bird Bear, Thomas Bird Bear, Inez Burr, Denise Cavanaugh, Doreen Charging, JoAnn Chase, Heather Demaray, Joyce Eakin, Darlene Edley, Estate of Nelson Fredericks, Donovan Fast Dog, George Fast Dog, Gloria Fast Dog, Sandra Gillette, Valeri Hosie, Mavis Huber, Karen Koite, Linda Kroupa, Jamie Lawrence, Evelyn Lone Bear, Betty Matthews, Joan Matthews, Sheridan Matthews, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Josephine Parenteau, Herbert Pleets, Monique Pleets, Marion Rasmuson, Deborah Staples, Darryl Turner, Anthony White Owl, Eugene White Owl, Eunice White Owl, Kathleen White Owl, Wilson White Owl, Albert Whitman, Rae Ann Williams, Tiffany Williams, Arnold Young Bird, Betty Young Bird, Joan Young Bird, Murphy Young Bird, Noreen Young Bird, Waylon Young Bird. (aej)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #33 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
February 21, 2019 Filing 37 Scheduling Recommendations Report on Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Positions Regarding Scheduling Order by Sharon Aubol, Margo Bean, Janet Benton, Amanda Bird Bear, Roger Bird Bear, Thomas Bird Bear, Inez Burr, Denise Cavanaugh, Doreen Charging, JoAnn Chase, Heather Demaray, Joyce Eakin, Darlene Edley, Estate of Nelson Fredericks, Donovan Fast Dog, George Fast Dog, Gloria Fast Dog, Sandra Gillette, Valeri Hosie, Mavis Huber, Karen Koite, Linda Kroupa, Jamie Lawrence, Evelyn Lone Bear, Betty Matthews, Joan Matthews, Sheridan Matthews, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Josephine Parenteau, Herbert Pleets, Monique Pleets, Marion Rasmuson, Deborah Staples, Darryl Turner, Anthony White Owl, Eugene White Owl, Eunice White Owl, Kathleen White Owl, Wilson White Owl, Albert Whitman, Rae Ann Williams, Tiffany Williams, Arnold Young Bird, Betty Young Bird, Joan Young Bird, Murphy Young Bird, Noreen Young Bird, Waylon Young Bird. (Harper, Keith)
February 21, 2019 Filing 36 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #32 MOTION to Certify Class , to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel by Sharon Aubol, Margo Bean, Janet Benton, Amanda Bird Bear, Roger Bird Bear, Thomas Bird Bear, Inez Burr, Denise Cavanaugh, Doreen Charging, JoAnn Chase, Heather Demaray, Joyce Eakin, Darlene Edley, Estate of Nelson Fredericks, Donovan Fast Dog, George Fast Dog, Gloria Fast Dog, Sandra Gillette, Valeri Hosie, Mavis Huber, Karen Koite, Linda Kroupa, Jamie Lawrence, Evelyn Lone Bear, Betty Matthews, Joan Matthews, Sheridan Matthews, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Josephine Parenteau, Herbert Pleets, Monique Pleets, Marion Rasmuson, Deborah Staples, Darryl Turner, Anthony White Owl, Eugene White Owl, Eunice White Owl, Kathleen White Owl, Wilson White Owl, Albert Whitman, Rae Ann Williams, Tiffany Williams, Arnold Young Bird, Betty Young Bird, Joan Young Bird, Murphy Young Bird, Noreen Young Bird, Waylon Young Bird. (Greene, Dustin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 34 DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** re #32 MOTION to Certify Class , to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel (aej)
February 20, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Vacation Letter for Jeffrey Webb (aej)
February 20, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification by JoAnn Chase. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memo in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(Harper, Keith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 32 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION to Certify Class , to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel by JoAnn Chase. (Harper, Keith) Modified on 2/21/2019 (aej).
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by JoAnn Chase. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harper, Keith)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
February 8, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Responsive Motions to Amended Complaint by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vidaurri, Aimee)
January 25, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants amending, filed by Anthony White Owl, Deborah Staples, Josephine Parenteau, Amanda Bird Bear, Darryl Turner, Joan Young Bird, Estate of Nelson Fredericks, JoAnn Chase, Murphy Young Bird, Linda Kroupa, Noreen Young Bird, Betty Matthews, Arnold Young Bird, Heather Demaray, Darlene Edley, Sharon Aubol, Mavis Huber, Joyce Eakin, Karen Koite, Jamie Lawrence, Waylon Young Bird, Kathleen White Owl, Rae Ann Williams, Tiffany Williams, George Fast Dog, Gloria Fast Dog, Sheridan Matthews, Denise Cavanaugh, Doreen Charging, Eunice White Owl, Joan Matthews, Monique Pleets, Inez Burr, Margo Bean, Thomas Bird Bear, Janet Benton, Evelyn Lone Bear, Betty Young Bird, Wilson White Owl, Roger Bird Bear, Herbert Pleets, Sandra Gillette, Eugene White Owl, Albert Whitman, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Donovan Fast Dog, Valeri Hosie, Marion Rasmuson.(Harper, Keith)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadlines to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss and to transfer are extended to February 15, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
January 10, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Defendants' Motion to Transfer by JoAnn Chase. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harper, Keith)
January 9, 2019 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support of #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of North Dakota by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 2)(aej)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert D. Comer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
January 4, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey A. Webb for Robert D. Comer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11612839) by on behalf of Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webb, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer to District of North Dakota by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 3), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3), #4 Exhibit 1 Part 3 of 3), #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit B)(Webb, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of North Dakota by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies and Lack of Primary Jurisdiction by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Webb, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 19 by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Webb, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Webb, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen M. Anstey on behalf of JoAnn Chase (Anstey, Stephen)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith M. Harper on behalf of JoAnn Chase (Harper, Keith)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dustin T. Greene on behalf of JoAnn Chase (Greene, Dustin)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoAnn Chase. Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC served on 10/15/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (Steed, Jason)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoAnn Chase. Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC served on 10/15/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (Steed, Jason)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoAnn Chase. Tesoro Companies, Inc. served on 10/15/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (Steed, Jason)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoAnn Chase. Andeavor served on 10/15/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (Steed, Jason)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoAnn Chase. Andeavor Logistics, L.P. served on 10/15/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (Steed, Jason)
November 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (aej)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The new deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is January 5, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Respond to Complaint by Andeavor, Andeavor Logistics, L.P., Tesoro Companies, Inc., Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC, Tesoro Logistics, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation and Joint Motion for Extension of Time)(Vidaurri, Aimee)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 Letter to attorney Dustin T. Greene regarding attorney admission to the Western District of Texas. (bc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Letter to attorney Stephen M. Anstey regarding attorney admission into the Western District of Texas. (bc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 Letter to attorney Lawrence S. Roberts regarding attorney admission into the Western District of Texas. (bc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Keith M. Harper regarding attorney admission to the Western District of Texas.(bc)
October 5, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
October 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by JoAnn Chase. (Steed, Jason)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11312537), filed by Anthony White Owl, Deborah Staples, Josephine Parenteau, Amanda Bird Bear, Darryl Turner, Joan Young Bird, Estate of Nelson Fredericks, JoAnn Chase, Murphy Young Bird, Linda Kroupa, Noreen Young Bird, Betty Matthews, Arnold Young Bird, Heather Demaray, Darlene Edley, Sharon Aubol, Mavis Huber, Joyce Eakin, Karen Koite, Jamie Lawrence, Waylon Young Bird, Kathleen White Owl, Rae Ann Williams, Tiffany Williams, George Fast Dog, Gloria Fast Dog, Sheridan Matthews, Denise Cavanaugh, Doreen Charging, Eunice White Owl, Joan Matthews, Monique Pleets, Inez Burr, Margo Bean, Thomas Bird Bear, Janet Benton, Evelyn Lone Bear, Betty Young Bird, Wilson White Owl, Roger Bird Bear, Herbert Pleets, Sandra Gillette, Eugene White Owl, Albert Whitman, Kenneth Matthews Sr., Donovan Fast Dog, Valeri Hosie, Marion Rasmuson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steed, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase et al v. Andeavor Logistics, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Chase
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mavis Huber
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lawrence
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Pleets
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Fredericks
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kroupa
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rae Ann Williams
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Young Bird
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Bird Bear
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Matthews Sr.
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Whitman
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony White Owl
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Fast Dog
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Fast Dog
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bird Bear
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Charging
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene White Owl
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Bean
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Williams
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeri Hosie
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreen Young Bird
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen White Owl
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson White Owl
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Demaray
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Matthews
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murphy Young Bird
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Cavanaugh
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Parenteau
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheridan Matthews
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Young Bird
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Lone Bear
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Rasmuson
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Turner
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez Burr
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Fast Dog
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Koite
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Edley
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Aubol
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Staples
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Benton
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Pleets
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Young Bird
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waylon Young Bird
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Eakin
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Gillette
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Matthews
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bird Bear
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice White Owl
Represented By: Jason P Steed
Represented By: Keith Michael Harper
Represented By: Dustin T. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Anstey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D Comer
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor
Represented By: Robert D Comer
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor Logistics, L.P.
Represented By: Robert D Comer
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC
Represented By: Robert D Comer
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Logistics GP, LLC
Represented By: Robert D Comer
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?