Bengtson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Darin R. Bengtson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00144
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Darin R. Bengtson. (cjs)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail resent to Richard Roy Lemay, 20 First Street SW, Ste. 201, Minot, North Dakota 58701. (cjs)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Notice of Direct Assignment. Mail resent to Richard Roy Lemay, 20 First Street SW, Ste. 201, Minot, North Dakota 58701. (cjs)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration served on 7/29/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (am)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Darin R. Bengtson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/19/2019. (cjs)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (cjs)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Burkland, Melissa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cjs)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (IFP granted) filed by Darin R. Bengtson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed to Attorney LeMay on 7/23/2019 (cjs).
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Darin R. Bengtson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/1/2019. (Mailed to Attorney LeMay)(rh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bengtson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin R. Bengtson
Represented By: Richard Roy LeMay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?