Fischer v. United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Ronald F. Fischer
Defendant: AIG Benefit Solutions and United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv00152
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AIG Benefit Solutions, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York. (Coffman, Danielle)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AIG Benefit Solutions, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York. (Coffman, Danielle)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until 9/03/2019 to file answers or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. (BG)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by AIG Benefit Solutions, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York. (Coffman, Danielle)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(am)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Ronald F. Fischer. (am)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit A - 2015 and 2016 Billable Hours to document: #1 Complaint by Ronald F. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Attending Physician's Statement)(Bakke, Randall)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ronald F. Fischer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/2/2019. (rh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AIG Benefit Solutions, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York. (rh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AIG Benefit Solutions, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000425) filed by Ronald F. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer v. United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald F. Fischer
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Benefit Solutions
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Danielle Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Danielle Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?