Bicker Farms, LLLP v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Plaintiff: Bicker Farms, LLLP
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00161
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC.(Forster, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary R. Eiken on behalf of Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC (Eiken, Zachary)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Jonathan Forster on behalf of Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC (Forster, Paul)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (rh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001248) filed by Bicker Farms, LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bicker Farms, LLLP v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bicker Farms, LLLP
Represented By: David C. Keagle
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?