Lesmeister v. Viterra, Inc.
Plaintiff: Travis Lesmeister
Defendant: Viterra, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00164
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 (TEXT ONLY) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 9/6/2019. (JS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (4 days)(JS)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(JS)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(JS)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Discovery Motions due by 3/31/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/1/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/1/2020. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 6/1/2020. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 6/1/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/3/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 9/30/2019. Amend Pleadings due by 9/30/2019. Amend Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 9/30/2019. Nondispositive Motions due by 10/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2020.(JS)
August 2, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerks office added Corporate Parent: 8001979 Canada Inc. to docket text. (js)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Viterra, Inc. (rh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viterra, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent 8001979 Canada Inc. (Thomas, Shea) Modified on 8/2/2019 to add Corporate parent to docket text. (js)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Viterra, Inc.. (Thomas, Shea)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Viterra, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/14/2019. (cjs)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Travis Lesmeister. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/14/2019. (cjs)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Viterra, Inc. from Ward County District Court. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 119001261 filed by Viterra, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Complaint, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lesmeister v. Viterra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Lesmeister
Represented By: James Edward Nostdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viterra, Inc.
Represented By: Shea Ashley Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?