Lopez v. TS Banking Group
Plaintiff: Monique Lopez
Defendant: TS Banking Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv00166
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by TS Banking Group. (rh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Kay Tvrdy on behalf of TS Banking Group (Tvrdy, Susan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by TS Banking Group. (Hartman, Kenneth)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to TS Banking Group. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/20/2019. (rh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Monique Lopez. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/20/2019. (rh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TS Banking Group from Williams Co. District Court, case number 53-2019-cv-1020. Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000448 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6/11/18 Letter from Tom Slorby to Bank of Tioga, #2 Exhibit B - Williams Co. Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. TS Banking Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Banking Group
Represented By: Kenneth W. Hartman
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Represented By: Susan Kay Tvrdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Lopez
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?