Kuntz v. Hochhalter
Plaintiff: Riley S. Kuntz
Defendant: Clare R. Hochalter and Clare R. Hochhalter
Case Number: 1:2019cv00167
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response due by 10/24/2019. (AS) Distributed on 9/24/2019 (js).
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Clare R. Hochhalter. (Rockstad, Kent)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Riley S. Kuntz. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
September 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 10/4/2019. See Order at #12 . (lf)
September 13, 2019 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM is CANCELLED. (AS)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #8 Motion to Stay. (AS) Distributed on 9/13/2019 (lf).
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay re #6 Order, Set Hearings, filed by Riley S. Kuntz. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Clare R. Hochhalter. (Rockstad, Kent)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Clare R. Hochhalter. (Rockstad, Kent)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay re #6 Order,, Set Hearings, by Clare R. Hochhalter. (Rockstad, Kent)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Clare R. Hochhalter of Receipt of Irregular Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Irregular Order)(Rockstad, Kent)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS) Distributed on 8/14/2019 (as).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Amending Case Caption by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS) Modified on 8/14/2019 to add additional text. Distributed on 8/14/2019. (as)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal finding as moot #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (CS) Distributed on 8/13/2019 (js).
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Clare R. Hochalter. (Rockstad, Kent)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Clare R. Hochalter. (Rockstad, Kent)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clare R. Hochalter from Burleigh Co. District Court, case number unknown. Filing fee waived. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Burleigh Co. Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Burleigh Co. Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Ex. A to Complaint - Law of the Case, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuntz v. Hochhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare R. Hochalter
Represented By: Kent Rockstad
Represented By: Nicholas W. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare R. Hochhalter
Represented By: Kent Rockstad
Represented By: Nicholas W. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley S. Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?