Bruce v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Donald G. Bruce
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00168
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #15 Response to Motion to Dismiss. Duplicate pleading, see #14 . Clerk's office restricted access to document. (pb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Donald G. Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 *RESTRICTED - DUPLICATE PLEADING FILED, SEE DOCUMENT #14 * RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Donald G. Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Bruce, Donald) Modified to restrict access on 10/2/2019 (pb).
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Donald G. Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Bruce, Donald)
October 1, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 Reply to Response to Motion. Wrong event selected/Error in document. Clerk's office restricted access to document. Filer will re-file document using the Response to Motion event. (rh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant Motion to Dismiss filed by Donald G. Bruce. (Bruce, Donald) Modified on 10/1/2019 to restrict access to document. (rh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment Petitioner's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Donald G. Bruce. (Bruce, Donald)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment by Donald G. Bruce. (Bruce, Donald)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (am) Modified on 9/16/2019 to add referral judge language. NEF regenerated and distributed (am).
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Ford Motor Company. (am)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Donald G. Bruce. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/18/2019. (rh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ford Motor Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/25/2019. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re #5 MEMORANDUM in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Sand, Benjamin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ford Motor Company. (Sand, Benjamin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ford Motor Company. (Sand, Benjamin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Donald G. Bruce. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/23/2019. (am)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (am)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition for Declaratory Relief) against Ford Motor Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001302) filed by Donald G. Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit P-A - Affidavit of Ronald Stuart Medrud, #3 Exhibit P-B - Summons and copy of complaint, Civil No. 17-10109, #4 Exhibit P-C - Order dated January 25, 2019, Civil No. 17-10109, #5 Exhibit P-D - Request for Permission to Appeal, Notice of Appeal & Motion for Stay, dated February 25, 2019, #6 Exhibit P-E - Order dated May 2, 2019, Case No. TMCA-19-003)(am) Modified on 8/9/2019 to add petition language. (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Joshua Brent Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald G. Bruce
Represented By: Donald G. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?