United States of America v. Walton et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Guardian and Protective Services, Inc., Estate of Kathleen M. Walton, Estate of James R. Walton, All Persons Unknown, James R. Walton and Kathleen M. Walton
Case Number: 1:2019cv00175
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Estate of James R. Walton served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019; James R. Walton served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019 (Burkland, Melissa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT for Service by Publication re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by United States of America. (Burkland, Melissa)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Guardian and Protective Services, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019 (Burkland, Melissa) Modified on 9/5/2019 to add amended. (as)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Guardian and Protective Services, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019 (Burkland, Melissa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Persons Unknown, Estate of James R. Walton, Estate of Kathleen M. Walton, Guardian and Protective Services, Inc., James R. Walton, Kathleen M. Walton. (cjs)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Persons Unknown, Estate of James R. Walton, Estate of Kathleen M. Walton, Guardian and Protective Services, Inc., James R. Walton, Kathleen M. Walton (Filing fee WAIVED) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Assumption Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-Real Estate Mortgage (Engbrecht), #5 Exhibit E-Assumption Agreement, #6 Exhibit F-Promissory Note, #7 Exhibit G-Real Estate Mortgage, #8 Exhibit H-Itemized Statement of Account, #9 Exhibit I-Notice of Intention, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Walton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian and Protective Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Kathleen M. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of James R. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?