Solomon v. Oasis Petroleum, LLC
Plaintiff: Andrew Solomon
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00180
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1(3 days) before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (change as to presiding judge only) (kmk)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case.(kmk)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/5/2019 to correct hearing time) (cjs). Regenerated on 12/5/2019 (cjs).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (3 days). (BG)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 8/7/2020. Discovery Motions due by 7/24/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/8/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/5/2020. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 6/26/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 7/24/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 1/10/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 7/24/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 7/24/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2020. (BG)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2019. (BG)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Oasis Petroleum, LLC.(Oster, Amy)
October 8, 2019 Oasis Petroleum, LLC answer due 10/21/2019. (cjs)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting #4 Stipulation filed by Oasis Petroleum, LLC. Defendant Oasis Petroleum, LLCs answer is due on or before 10/21/2019.(MM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer by Oasis Petroleum, LLC. (Oster, Amy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy M. Oster on behalf of Oasis Petroleum, LLC (Oster, Amy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Oasis Petroleum, LLC. (am)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oasis Petroleum, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001363) filed by Andrew Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Collective Action)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Oasis Petroleum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Solomon
Represented By: Andrew Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?