Lewis v. Shafer Project Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Lewis
Defendant: Shafer Project Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00183
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Case transferred to Southern District of Texas. (am)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #5 Motion to Change Venue. Case is transferred to the Southern District of Texas. (kmk)
October 18, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 REPLY to Response to Motion. Clerk's office added descriptions to exhibits. (am)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Shafer Project Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion, Turner v. Utiliquest, Civ. No. 3:18-cv-00294, #2 Exhibit B - Original Petition, Lewis v. Brittmoore Animal Hospital, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Assumed Name Records Dry County Bullies, #4 Exhibit D - Screenshots of Dry County Bullies website, #5 Exhibit E - Harris County Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Kaylynn Boyd, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Brent Hatcher, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Mike Garland, #9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Scott Staehnke, #10 Exhibit J - Declaration of Hilton Dozeman, #11 Exhibit K - Declaration of George Jennings, #12 Exhibit L - Declaration of Jeff Davey, #13 Exhibit M - Declaration of Paul Miller, #14 Exhibit N - Declaration of Matt Scogin, #15 Exhibit O - Declaration of Skyler Johnson)(Pipitone, Daniel) Modified on 10/18/2019 to exhibit descriptions (am).
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dunlap on behalf of Michael Lewis (Dunlap, Andrew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Michael Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Shafer Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - LinkedIn Profiles)(Josephson, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shafer Project Resources, Inc.. (Karns, Amber)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shafer Project Resources, Inc.. (Pipitone, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Subject to Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Shafer Project Resources, Inc..(Pipitone, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue by Shafer Project Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Faludi v. U.S. Shale Sols., L.L.C., No. 17-20808, 2019 U.S. App. LEXIS 24936, (5th Cir. 2019), #2 Exhibit B - Collective Action Complaint in TXSD case 2:19-cv-186, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kaylynn Boyd)(Pipitone, Daniel) Modified on 9/27/2019 to add exhibit descriptions. (js)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Lewis. Shafer Project Resources, Inc. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019 (Josephson, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Josephson on behalf of Michael Lewis (Josephson, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shafer Project Resources, Inc.. (am)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shafer Project Resources, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001379) filed by Michael Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Wage Claim)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Shafer Project Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shafer Project Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel D Pipitone
Represented By: Amber Lea Karns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lewis
Represented By: William R. Liles
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Richard Burch
Represented By: Andrew Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?