Duffy v. ConocoPhillips Company
Plaintiff: John Duffy
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00184
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 10/28/2019. (JS) Modified on 10/30/2019 to correct date of scheduling conference (cjs). Regenerated on 10/30/2019 (cjs).
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (5 days) (JS)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Join Additional Parties due by 12/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2019. Nondispositive Motions due by 3/20/2020. (JS)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Cheeseman on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Cheeseman, Kimberly)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Burch on behalf of John Duffy (Burch, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dunlap on behalf of John Duffy (Dunlap, Andrew)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company.(Oster, Amy)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring case to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by John Duffy. (rh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to John Duffy. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/30/2019. (cjs)
September 10, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Duplicate filing, see #4 . Clerk's office restricted access to document. (am)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED - DUPLICATE FILING, SEE DOCUMENT AT #4 * SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Duffy. (Josephson, Michael) Modified on 9/10/2019 to restrict access(am).
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Josephson on behalf of John Duffy (Josephson, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Duffy. ConocoPhillips Company served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019 (Liles, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to John Duffy. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/17/2019. (am)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ConocoPhillips Company. (am)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ConocoPhillips Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001379) filed by John Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Wage Claim)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Duffy
Represented By: William R. Liles
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Richard Burch
Represented By: Andrew Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Represented By: Kimberly Cheeseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?