Sawyer v. EOG Resources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Sawyer
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc., John Does, John Doe Pipe Inspection Company and John Doe Company Man
Case Number: 1:2019cv00186
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 11/01/2019 is canceled. It shall be rescheduled at later date and time. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to EOG Resources, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/4/2019. (rh)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Modified on 10/7/2019 to correct time of conference. NEF regenerated (am).
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to EOG Resources, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/21/2019. (am)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by EOG Resources, Inc..(Boschee, Larry)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Michael Sawyer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/30/2019. (cjs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed (Proof of Service) filed by Michael Sawyer. EOG Resources, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Drew, Noah)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Michael Sawyer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/18/2019. (lf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Does, EOG Resources, Inc., John Doe Company Man, John Doe Pipe Inspection Company. (lf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does, EOG Resources, Inc., John Doe Company Man, John Doe Pipe Inspection Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000491) filed by Michael Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. EOG Resources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Pipe Inspection Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Company Man
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Noah W. Drew
Represented By: Mel C. Orchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?