McWhorter et al v. Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel, William Kainz and GeoChemicals, LLC
Defendant: Boyd Meduna, Jesse Smyle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC and Jason Biffle
Case Number: 1:2019cv00189
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GeoChemicals, LLC, William Kainz, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel. (Pelham, Zachary)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Janet A. Hendrick. (rh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Janet A. Hendrick (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1840910) by Jason Biffle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Boyd Meduna, Jesse Smyle. (Hendrick, Janet) Modified on 10/9/2019 to add receipt number. (rh)
October 7, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendants' Response In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Vern Disney)(Grant, Nicholas)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #25 Stipulation to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
October 2, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #25 Stipulation. Modified entry to reflect additional filers Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel and William Kainz. (cjs)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by GeoChemicals, LLC, Ronald Rebel, Dirk McWhorter, William Kainz. (Pelham, Zachary) Modified on 10/2/2019 to add filers (cjs).
September 24, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #23 MOTION to Remand and #24 MEMORANDUM in Support. Modified entry to reflect additional filers Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel, and William Kainz. (pb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel, and William Kainz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Verified Petition, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Sami Wilson, #3 Exhibit C-Cease and Desist Letter 5-9-2019, #4 Exhibit D-Janet Hendrick Letter 6-3-2019)(Pelham, Zachary) Modified to add additional filers on 9/24/2019 (pb).
September 23, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel, and William Kainz. (Pelham, Zachary) Modified add additional filers on 9/24/2019 (pb).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Michael J. Geiermann substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiff Dirk McWhorter. Attorney Jeffrey Kuhlman; Zachary E. Pelham; Kirsten H. Tuntland; Sean D Walsh; Quinn P. Fylling and Mitchell Lee Herren terminated as to Plaintiff Dirk McWhorter. (BG)
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Dirk McWhorter. (Pelham, Zachary)
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas C. Grant re #19 MEMORANDUM in Support by Jason Biffle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Boyd Meduna, Jesse Smyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Temporary Restraining Order issued by the Rice County, Kansas, District Court, #2 Exhibit 2-Answer, Counterclaim, and Third-Party Claim of GeoChemicals, LLC, #3 Exhibit 3-Answer of Defendant William Kainz, filed in the Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC v. William Kainz, et al, #4 Exhibit 4-McWhorter Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 5-Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed by GeoChemicals, LLC, #6 Exhibit 6-Answer of GeoChemicals, LLC, filed by GeoChemicals, LLC, #7 Exhibit 7-Answer of Ronald Rebel, filed in the Rice County, Kansas, #8 Exhibit 8-Plaintiff Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLCs Response to Defendant Dirk McWhorters Motion to Dismiss, filed in the Rice County, Kansas,, #9 Exhibit 9-Plaintiff Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLCs Response to Defendant GeoChemicals, LLCs Motion to Dismiss, filed in the Rice County, Kansas)(Grant, Nicholas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jason Biffle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Boyd Meduna, Jesse Smyle. (Grant, Nicholas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Jason Biffle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Boyd Meduna, Jesse Smyle. (Grant, Nicholas)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean D. Walsh. (js)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jason Biffle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Boyd Meduna, Jesse Smyle. (cjs)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey M. Kuhlman. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey Kuhlman (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001425) by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel. (Kuhlman, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add receipt number and attorney name. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jesse Smyle. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ronald Rebel. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Boyd Meduna. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dirk McWhorter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to William Kainz. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to GeoChemicals, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jason Biffle. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mitchell L. Herren. (rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean D. Walsh (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000499) by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel. (Walsh, Sean) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add receipt number and attorney name (pb).
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mitchell Herren (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001424) by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel. (Herren, Mitchell) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add receipt number and attorney name. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jesse Smyle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Jason Biffle, Boyd Meduna from Stark County District Court, case number 45-2019-cv-703. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001420. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Records, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Vern Disney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McWhorter et al v. Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirk McWhorter
Represented By: Quinn P. Fylling
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Represented By: Sean D Walsh
Represented By: Jeffrey Kuhlman
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Herren
Represented By: Michael J. Geiermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rebel
Represented By: Quinn P. Fylling
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Represented By: Sean D Walsh
Represented By: Jeffrey Kuhlman
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kainz
Represented By: Michael J. Geiermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GeoChemicals, LLC
Represented By: Quinn P. Fylling
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Represented By: Sean D Walsh
Represented By: Jeffrey Kuhlman
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd Meduna
Represented By: Shea Ashley Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Represented By: Janet Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Smyle
Represented By: Shea Ashley Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Represented By: Janet Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC
Represented By: Shea Ashley Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Represented By: Janet Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Biffle
Represented By: Shea Ashley Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Represented By: Janet Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?