McGinnis v. Songer et al
Plaintiff: Neil McGinnis
Defendant: Mr. Adam LNU, Corey Lee, North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, N.D. Bureau of Criminal Investigations, Ms. Doris Songer and Laurie LNU
Case Number: 1:2019cv00190
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #17 Clerk's Judgment, #16 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Report and Recommendations. Address Unknown. (cjs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #11 MOTION to Compel filed by Neil McGinnis, #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Neil McGinnis, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Neil McGinnis, #4 MOTION to Appoint Special Master file. Address unknown. (cjs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 14 Order Reassigning Case. Address unknown. (cjs)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 JUDGMENT by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(cjs) Distributed on 10/22/2019 (cjs).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #15 Report and Recommendations; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and finding as moot all other pending motions. (kmk) Distributed on 10/22/2019 (cjs).
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #11 MOTION to Compel filed by Neil McGinnis, #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Neil McGinnis, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Neil McGinnis, #4 MOTION to Appoint Special Master filed by Neil McGinnis. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG) Distributed on 10/15/2019. (rh)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.Case reassigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case, as presiding judge. (kmk) Distributed on 10/15/2019. (rh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #8 Order to Show Cause. Mail not resent to Neil McGinnis. Current address unknown. (am) Modified on 10/1/2019 to add document to the entry. NEF regenerated (am).
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #8 Order to Show Cause. Mail resent to Neil McGinnis, Burleigh Morton Detention Center, PO Box 2499, 4100 Apple Creek Road, Bismarck, ND 58502-1416. (cjs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Neil McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Neil McGinnis. (rh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Neil McGinnis (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2019. (BG) Distributed on 9/17/2019. (rh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to document: #3 PLRA Packet by Neil McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Neil McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Neil McGinnis. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/27/2019. (rh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Special Master by Neil McGinnis. (rh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Neil McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets, #2 Mailing Envelopes)(rh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGinnis v. Songer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Adam LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.D. Bureau of Criminal Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Doris Songer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?