Puklich v. Holbrook
Petitioner: Shelly Mae Puklich
Respondent: Tanya Holbrook
Case Number: 1:2019cv00194
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Tanya Holbrook against Shelly Mae Puklich. The defendant's motion to dismiss is granted. Distributed.(rh)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #2 Motion to Dismiss (MM) Distributed on 10/23/2019. (rh)
October 23, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 RESPONSE to Motion. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as REPLY to Response at #14 . (as)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Vacate Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining OrderMOTION to Dismiss Action filed by Tanya Holbrook. (as)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Vacate Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining OrderMOTION to Dismiss Action In Support filed by Tanya Holbrook. (Thomas, James) Modified on 10/23/2019 to restrict access. (as)
September 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Vacate Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining OrderMOTION to Dismiss Action. Responses due by 10/17/2019 Replies due by 10/31/2019. (cjs)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland finding as moot #3 Motion to Set Expedited Briefing Schedule. See Doc. No. 11. (CM) Distributed on 9/25/2019. (rh)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (CM) Distributed on 9/25/2019. (rh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2019 re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Action filed by Tanya Holbrook and #3 MOTION to Set Expedited Briefing Schedule re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Action filed by Tanya Holbrook. (Court Reporter SE) (jr)
September 20, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Supplement. Clerk's Office added link, modified docket text and added exhibit description. (cjs)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL FILING RE BISMARCK POLICE DEPARTMENT INCIDENT REPORT by Tanya Holbrook re #2 Motion to Vacate, Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Incident Report)(Thomas, James) Modified on 9/20/2019 to add link, modify docket text and add exhibit description (cjs).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland finding as moot #7 Motion clarification; granting #2 Motion to Vacate Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order. (MM) Distributed on 9/19/2019. (rh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Clarification of Order re #6 Order on Motion for Hearing by Tanya Holbrook. (Thomas, James)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 5 Motion for Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2019 at 01:30 PM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (MM) Distributed on 9/16/2019 (am).
September 13, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 MOTION to Set Expedited Briefing Schedule. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed Motion for Hearing at 5 and removed link. (am)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing by Tanya Holbrook. See document at #3 . (am)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 USM RETURN of Service re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Motion to Vacate, Motion to Dismiss, and #3 Motion to Set Expedited Briefing Schedule on 9/12/19 upon Shelly Puklich (rh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Set Expedited Briefing Schedule re #2 MOTION to Vacate Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining OrderMOTION to Dismiss Action by Tanya Holbrook. (Thomas, James) Modified on 9/13/2019 to remove link (am).
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order, MOTION to Dismiss Action by Tanya Holbrook. (Thomas, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tanya Holbrook from Burleigh Co. District Court, case number 08-2019-cv-2787. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puklich v. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tanya Holbrook
Represented By: James P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shelly Mae Puklich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?