BNI Coal, Ltd. v. Local Union 1593 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Plaintiff: BNI Coal, Ltd.
Defendant: Local Union 1593 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00205
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 11/22/2019 (cjs)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Local Union 1593 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers answer and response to motion for summary judgment due 11/22/2019. (MM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNI Coal, Ltd. re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #1 Complaint, (Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint and to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment) (Forward, Robin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #1 Complaint, (Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint and to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment) by BNI Coal, Ltd.. (Forward, Robin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BNI Coal, Ltd.. Local Union 1593 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019 (Forward, Robin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNI Coal, Ltd. re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #4 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,, (Forward, Robin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BNI Coal, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Mike Heger, #2 Exhibit 1-A-Expired Labor Agreement-BNI & Local Union No. 1593, effective 4-1-14--3-31-19, #3 Exhibit 1-B-1-4-19 Letter from Frank to BNI, #4 Exhibit 1-C-8-14-19 Email from Jason Frank, #5 Exhibit 1-D-Labor Agreement between BNI and Local Union No. 1593 effective 7-1-90--3-31-95, #6 Exhibit 1-E-Proposal by Union dated 3-9-4, #7 Exhibit 1-F-Proposal by Union dated 3-12-04, #8 Exhibit 1-G-6-30-95 Memorandum between BNI and Union, #9 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Dominic Cecere, #10 Exhibit 2-A-1-17-19 letter from Stinson to Jason Frank, #11 Exhibit 2-B-Confirmation of Extension dated 4-11-19, #12 Exhibit 2-C-Confirmation of Extension dated 5-19-19, #13 Exhibit 3-August 11, 1995 Interest Arbitration Opinion and Award, #14 Exhibit 4-Sheet Metal Workers' Int'l Assoc., Local 14 v. Aldrich Air Conditioning, Inc.)(Forward, Robin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BNI Coal, Ltd.. (Forward, Robin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Local Union 1593 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (rh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local Union 1593 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001458) filed by BNI Coal, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) Modified on 9/19/2019 to add receipt number. Regenerated NEF. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNI Coal, Ltd. v. Local Union 1593 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNI Coal, Ltd.
Represented By: Robin Wade Forward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Union 1593 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?