White River Royalties, LLC et al v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Plaintiff: White River Royalties, LLC and Sara Cammack
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00218
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 12/20/2019. Replies due by 1/24/2020. (am)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #15 Stipulation. Plaintiffs' response to defendant's motion to Dismiss due by 12/20/2019. Defendant's reply due by 1/24/2020. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by White River Royalties, LLC. (Swanson, Joshua)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (am)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (am)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hess Corporation for Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC.. (Forster, Paul)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ragan Naresh on behalf of Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC (Naresh, Ragan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. Donovan on behalf of Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC (Donovan, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #6 Stipulation. Defendant shall have until 11/12/2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Sara Cammack, White River Royalties, LLC. (rh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Sara Cammack. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/17/2019. (js)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to White River Royalties, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/17/2019. (js)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (js)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000007) filed by White River Royalties, LLC, Sara Cammack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White River Royalties, LLC et al v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Daniel T. Donovan
Represented By: Ragan Naresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White River Royalties, LLC
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Cammack
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?