56th Street Properties, LLC v. Rodan Transport (USA) Ltd.
Plaintiff: 56th Street Properties, LLC
Defendant: Rodan Transport (USA) Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00222
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER: The Scheduling Conference is REset for 12/13/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. The parties shall submit a proposed plan for the court's consideration at least 2 days prior to the conference. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Conference previously set for 12/06/2019) (BG)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Rodan Transport (USA) Ltd..(Porsborg, Scott)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott K. Porsborg on behalf of Rodan Transport (USA) Ltd. (Porsborg, Scott)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Veenstra. (js)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew Veenstra (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-1842514) by 56th Street Properties, LLC. (Veenstra, Matthew) Modified on 10/15/2019 to add receipt number. (js)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rodan Transport (USA) Ltd.. (am)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rodan Transport (USA) Ltd. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000040) filed by 56th Street Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Terminal Lease, #2 Exhibit 2 - Residential Lease, #3 Exhibit 3 - Residential Lease Settlement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 56th Street Properties, LLC v. Rodan Transport (USA) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 56th Street Properties, LLC
Represented By: Samuel W. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodan Transport (USA) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?