Knowles v. North Dakota, State of et al
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Defendant: North Dakota, State of, Bismarck PD, SWATT TEAM and Burleig County Court House
Case Number: 1:2019cv00227
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of USCA as to #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. Appellant is directed to pay the $505 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis by January 9, 2020. (cjs)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Bismarck PD, Burleig County Court House, North Dakota, State of, SWATT TEAM against Efrain Reyes Knowles.(am) Distributed on 12/10/2019 (am).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #8 Report and Recommendations. and denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kmk) Distributed on 12/10/2019 (am).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. This case is remanded to the District Court for the limited purpose of determining the Appellant's IFP status. (cjs)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 USCA ORDER Requesting Paper Record of Non-ECF Documents re #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. None exist at this time. (cjs)
December 9, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-3628 for #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (cjs)
December 5, 2019 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet re #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal mailed to Efrain Reyes Knowles. (pb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (pb)
November 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. Objections to R&R due by 12/6/2019 (as)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Objection to R&R due 12/6/2019. (BG) Distributed on 11/21/2019. (rh) Modified on 11/25/2019 to add objection deadline. (as)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #5 Order to Show Cause by Efrain Reyes Knowles. Filing fee: Not paid. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Court of Appeals, #2 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge in the case. by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.(td)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(td) Modified on 11/12/2019 to correct the date of filing. (td).
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Show Cause Response due by 11/18/2019. (BG) Distributed on 10/29/2019 (am).
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/6/2019. (cjs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. North Dakota, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bismarck PD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWATT TEAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burleig County Court House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?