Knowles v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Defendant: Donald Trumph, United States of America and Congress
Case Number: 1:2019cv00228
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of USCA as to #3 Notice of Appeal filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. Remanded to the District Court for the limited purpose of determining Appellant's IFP status. (cjs)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 USCA ORDER Requesting Paper Record of Non-ECF Documents re #3 Notice of Appeal. None exist at this time. (cjs)
December 9, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-3622 for #3 Notice of Appeal. (cjs)
December 5, 2019 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet re #3 Notice of Appeal mailed to Efrain Reyes Knowles. (pb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #3 Notice of Appeal (pb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Efrain Reyes Knowles. Filing fee: Not paid. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Court of Appeals, #2 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
November 7, 2019 Civil Case terminated for failure to complete PLRA Litigation Packet. Original documents returned to inmate. (am)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Efrain Knowles (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (cjs)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (rh) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/17/2019 to correct caption. Resent to Mr. Knowles.) (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Reyes Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?