Gipp et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Skylar Gipp, Elias Gipp and Shayla Gipp
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00233
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Thomas, James)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Elias Gipp, Shayla Gipp, Skylar Gipp. (Conlin, Thomas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Stephanie Cloud-Mountain Lion re #7 MEMORANDUM in Support by United States of America. (Thomas, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Thomas, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Thomas, James)
October 24, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 Summons Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Summons Returned Executed as to USA at #5 . (cjs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for certified mailings pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(i)(1)(B) and 4(i)(2))(cjs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elias Gipp, Skylar Gipp, Shayla Gipp. United States of America served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for certified mailings pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(i)(1)(B) and 4(i)(2))(Stennes, Stacy) Modified on 10/24/2019 to restrict access (cjs).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER: The Clerks office shall seal Exhibit A to the #1 Complaint as it contains sensitive personal information. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cjs)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000071) filed by Elias Gipp, Skylar Gipp, Shayla Gipp. (Attachments: #1 *SEALED* Exhibit A-Claim for Damage, Injury or Death, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs) Modified on 10/23/2019 to seal Exhibit A per Order at #3. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gipp et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylar Gipp
Represented By: Thomas J. Conlin
Represented By: Stacy Deery Stennes
Represented By: James W. Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Gipp
Represented By: Thomas J. Conlin
Represented By: Stacy Deery Stennes
Represented By: James W. Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayla Gipp
Represented By: Thomas J. Conlin
Represented By: Stacy Deery Stennes
Represented By: James W. Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tara V. Iversen
Represented By: James P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?