United States of America v. Renschler
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Sandra K. Renschler
Case Number: 1:2019cv00235
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 Abstract of Judgment requested by USA. (rh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Sandra K. Renschler by Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(am)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT by Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(am)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sandra K. Renschler (rh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT /Declaration of Default; Declaration of Amount Due; Statement of Costs; and Declaration of No Military Service re #4 MOTION for Entry of Default , #5 MOTION for Default Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Indebtedness)(Iversen, Tara)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Judgment by United States of America. (Iversen, Tara)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default by United States of America. (Iversen, Tara)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Sandra K. Renschler served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 (Iversen, Tara)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sandra K. Renschler. (am)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandra K. Renschler (Filing fee: waived) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application/Promissory Note (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Indebtedness, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Renschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra K. Renschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tara V. Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?