Cooley v. Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Cooley
Defendant: Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00246
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 1/9/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Conference previously set for 1/09/2020 at 9:00 AM) (BG)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc..(Leibel, Steven)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by David Cooley. (rh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc.. (am)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to David Cooley. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/2/2019. (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/3/2019. (am)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Cooley. Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019 (Redmann, Christopher)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven James Leibel on behalf of Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc. (Leibel, Steven)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to David Cooley. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/22/2019. (rh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc. (rh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000137) filed by David Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cooley
Represented By: Christopher Redmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antelope Creek Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Joyner
Represented By: Steven James Leibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?