Mallory v. Engineering Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Troy Mallory
Defendant: Engineering Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00248
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Mallory. Engineering Services, LLC served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019 (Josephson, Michael)
December 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Josephson on behalf of Troy Mallory (Josephson, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (cjs)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Troy Mallory. (cjs)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Troy Mallory. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/26/2019. (am)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Engineering Services, LLC. (am)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Engineering Services, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000149) filed by Troy Mallory. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Written Consent)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallory v. Engineering Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineering Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Mallory
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Richard Burch
Represented By: Andrew Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?