Matthews v. Sayler
Petitioner: Antonio Raheem Matthews
Respondent: James Sayler
Case Number: 1:2019cv00259
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) filed by Antonio Raheem Matthews. Objections to R&R due by 1/24/2020. Erroneously set for 12/24/19. (rh)
December 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) filed by Antonio Raheem Matthews. Objections to R&R due by 12/24/2019 (rh)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Objections due by 1/24/2020. (BG) Distributed on 12/20/2019. (rh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) filed by Antonio Raheem Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Antonio Raheem Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
December 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) filed by Antonio Raheem Matthews. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2020 (am)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) filed by Antonio Raheem Matthews by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 12/10/2019 (am). (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/19/2019 to correct objection due date. Re-distributed.) (rh)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Reassigning case to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case, as presiding judge. (kmk) Distributed on 12/10/2019 (am).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 11/26/2019. (rh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Antonio Raheem Matthews. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/9/2019. (cjs)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Antonio Raheem Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Raheem Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Sayler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Raheem Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Sayler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?