Wright v. McQuade Distributing Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright
Defendant: McQuade Distributing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00264
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler S. Carlson on behalf of McQuade Distributing Co., Inc. (Carlson, Tyler)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 1/29/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. To participate in the conference, counsel should call the telephone number and enter the access code previously provided. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Conference previously set for 1/29/2020 at 9:00 AM) (BG)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by McQuade Distributing Co., Inc..(Quinton, Corey)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jon Q. Wright. All Defendants (Fremstad, Joel)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.(rh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by McQuade Distributing Co., Inc. (rh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jon Q. Wright. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/23/2019. (rh)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to McQuade Distributing Co., Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2019. (js)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey J. Quinton on behalf of McQuade Distributing Co., Inc. (Quinton, Corey)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action. AO-121 Form mailed to Register of Copyrights. (rh)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jon Q. Wright. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/10/2019. (rh)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to McQuade Distributing Co., Inc. (rh)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McQuade Distributing Co., Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000195) filed by Jon Q. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Exeplar of Defendant's use of illustration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. McQuade Distributing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McQuade Distributing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Tyler S. Carlson
Represented By: Corey J. Quinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright
Represented By: Joel M. Fremstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?