Soo Line Railroad Company v. Dakota Gold Transfer-Plaza
Plaintiff: Soo Line Railroad Company
Defendant: Dakota Gold Transfer-Plaza
Case Number: 1:2019cv00268
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dakota Gold Transfer-Plaza.(Grossman, Lee)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (am)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Soo Line Railroad Company. (am)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Soo Line Railroad Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/6/2020. (am)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John K Fiorilla on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fiorilla, John)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Soo Line Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Canadian Pacific Railway, Ltd. for Soo Line Railroad Company.. (Hanson, Mark)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Soo Line Railroad Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2019. (cjs)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dakota Gold Transfer-Plaza. (cjs)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dakota Gold Transfer-Plaza (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000086) filed by Soo Line Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Statement of Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soo Line Railroad Company v. Dakota Gold Transfer-Plaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Gold Transfer-Plaza
Represented By: Lee M. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soo Line Railroad Company
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Represented By: John K Fiorilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?