Dinga v. Dinga et al
Plaintiff: Ryan K. Dinga
Defendant: Rhonda Kingsley, Kevin Kingsley, Myron Dinga, Susan Dinga, Byron Dinga and Janice Dinga
Case Number: 1:2019cv00273
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Byron Dinga, Janice Dinga, Kevin Kingsley, Myron Dinga, Rhonda Kingsley, Susan Dinga against Ryan K. Dinga by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. The defendants' motion to dismiss is granted and the matter is dismissed without prejudice.(rh) Distributed on 2/10/2020. (rh)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (BG) Distributed on 2/10/2020. (rh)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Byron Dinga, Janice Dinga, Myron Dinga, Susan Dinga, Kevin Kingsley, Rhonda Kingsley. (am)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Rhonda Kingsley. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/24/2020. (rh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kevin Kingsley. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/24/2020. (rh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Susan Dinga. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/24/2020. (rh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Myron Dinga. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/24/2020. (rh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Janice Dinga. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/24/2020. (rh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Byron Dinga. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/24/2020. (rh)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Byron Dinga, Janice Dinga, Myron Dinga, Susan Dinga, Kevin Kingsley, Rhonda Kingsley re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MEMORANDUM in Support (Sanderson, Paul)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Byron Dinga, Janice Dinga, Myron Dinga, Susan Dinga, Kevin Kingsley, Rhonda Kingsley. (Sanderson, Paul)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Byron Dinga, Janice Dinga, Myron Dinga, Susan Dinga, Kevin Kingsley, Rhonda Kingsley. (Sanderson, Paul)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Ryan K. Dinga. (rh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Byron Dinga, Janice Dinga, Myron Dinga, Susan Dinga, Kevin Kingsley, Rhonda Kingsley. (cjs)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ryan K. Dinga. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/27/2019. (cjs)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Byron Dinga, Janice Dinga, Myron Dinga, Susan Dinga, Kevin Kingsley, Rhonda Kingsley (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000259) filed by Ryan K. Dinga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dinga v. Dinga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Kingsley
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kingsley
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Dinga
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Dinga
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Dinga
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Dinga
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan K. Dinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?