SpoofCard, LLC et al v. Burgum et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Pietrocola and SpoofCard, LLC
Defendant: Hon. Doug Burgum and Hon. Wayne Stenehjem
Case Number: 1:2019cv00276
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
January 24, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Modified entry to remove incorrect filer Doug Burgum. Party has been terminated pursuant to Order at #10 . (am)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting #8 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Burgum filed by Amanda Pietrocola, SpoofCard, LLC.(MM)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wayne Stenehjem.(Nicolai, James) Modified on 1/24/2020 to remove incorrect filer (am).
January 23, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 STIPULATION. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Stipulation of Dismissal at #8 . (am)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice the Hon. Doug Burgum, Governor of the State of North Dakota, in His Official Capacity by Amanda Pietrocola, SpoofCard, LLC. (am)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* STIPULATION to Dismiss Without Prejudice the Hon. Doug Burgum, Govenor of the State of North Dakota, in His Official Capacity by Amanda Pietrocola, SpoofCard, LLC. (Thompson, Seth) Modified on 1/23/2020 to restrict access (am).
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SpoofCard, LLC, Amanda Pietrocola. Wayne Stenehjem served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020 (Thompson, Seth)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SpoofCard, LLC, Amanda Pietrocola. Doug Burgum served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020 (Thompson, Seth)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Sagsveen on behalf of Doug Burgum, Wayne Stenehjem (Sagsveen, Matthew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Nicolai on behalf of All Defendants (Nicolai, James)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Doug Burgum, Wayne Stenehjem. (rh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doug Burgum, Wayne Stenehjem (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000265) filed by SpoofCard, LLC, Amanda Pietrocola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - House Bill No. 1161, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SpoofCard, LLC et al v. Burgum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Doug Burgum
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Represented By: James E. Nicolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Wayne Stenehjem
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Represented By: James E. Nicolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Pietrocola
Represented By: Seth A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SpoofCard, LLC
Represented By: Seth A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?