United States of America v. Wiese et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Donna L. Wiese, Donna Wiese, Bruce Alan Wiese, Jr., Cavalry SPV I, LLC and Midland Funding LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00287
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Midland Funding LLC, Bruce Alan Wiese, Jr, Donna L. Wiese by Judge Daniel M. Traynor.(cjs)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Daniel M. Traynor.(CK)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting #8 Motion for Default Judgment. (CK)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Midland Funding LLC, Bruce Alan Wiese, Jr, Donna L. Wiese (rh)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Default re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Itemized Statement of Account)(Schoepf, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment by United States of America. (Schoepf, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by United States of America. (Schoepf, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk) Modified on 2/7/2020 to correct typographical error. NEF regenerated (am).
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Donna L. Wiese served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020 (Schoepf, Michael)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Bruce Alan Wiese, Jr served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020 (Schoepf, Michael)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Cavalry SPV I, LLC served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020; Midland Funding LLC served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (Schoepf, Michael)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Midland Funding LLC, Bruce Alan Wiese, Jr, Donna L. Wiese. (rh)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Midland Funding LLC, Bruce Alan Wiese, Jr, Donna L. Wiese (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Redacted Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted First Modification of Note, #4 Exhibit D - Redacted - Statement of Additional Advance, #5 Exhibit E - Certificate of Indebtedness, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Intention to Foreclose Real Estate Mortgage, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wiese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna L. Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Alan Wiese, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?