Broughton et al v. Davis
Plaintiff: Kimberly Anderson and Stephonie Broughton
Defendant: Reuben Joshua Davis
Case Number: 1:2020cv00010
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Reuben Joshua Davis.(Zuger, Jack)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack E. Zuger on behalf of Reuben Joshua Davis (Zuger, Jack)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reuben Joshua Davis filed by Stephonie Broughton, Kimberly Anderson.(Nostdahl, James)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Reuben Joshua Davis. (rh)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reuben Joshua Davis (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000157) filed by Stephonie Broughton, Kimberly Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broughton et al v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Anderson
Represented By: James Edward Nostdahl
Represented By: Stuart R. Nostdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephonie Broughton
Represented By: James Edward Nostdahl
Represented By: Stuart R. Nostdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reuben Joshua Davis
Represented By: Jack E. Zuger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?