United States of America v. Scheeler et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Wyatt Nelson, All Persons Unknown, Claiming any Estate or Interest, Wade Nelson, Nancy R. Scheeler and Westen Nelson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00018
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. All Persons Unknown, Claiming any Estate or Interest served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020; Nancy R. Scheeler served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Publication, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mailing)(Schoepf, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT For Service by Publication re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by United States of America. (Schoepf, Michael)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Wade Nelson served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Westen Nelson served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020; Wyatt Nelson served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020 (Schoepf, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Persons Unknown, Claiming any Estate or Interest, Wade Nelson, Westen Nelson, Wyatt Nelson, Nancy R. Scheeler. (rh)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Persons Unknown, Claiming any Estate or Interest, Wade Nelson, Westen Nelson, Wyatt Nelson, Nancy R. Scheeler filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Reamortization Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Itemized Statement of Account, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Scheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyatt Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown, Claiming any Estate or Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy R. Scheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westen Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?