Holm v. MDU Resources Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Judith Holm
Defendant: 401(k) Retirement Plan, New York Life Trust Company, MDU Resources Group, Inc. and John Hancock Trust Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00038
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to MDU Resources Group, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/12/2020. (as)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to John Hancock Trust Company, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/12/2020. (as)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Judith Holm. New York Life Trust Company waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Chapman, Charles)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants shall have until 6/20/2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R. Sanderson on behalf of MDU Resources Group, Inc. (Sanderson, Paul)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judith Holm. John Hancock Trust Company, LLC served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020; MDU Resources Group, Inc. served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020 (Chapman, Charles)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Ward on behalf of John Hancock Trust Company, LLC (Ward, Patrick)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Agreed) by John Hancock Trust Company, LLC. (Ward, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Ward on behalf of John Hancock Trust Company, LLC (Ward, John)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Judith Holm. (rh)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Judith Holm. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/30/2020. (am)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Judith Holm. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/19/2020. (am)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 401(k) Retirement Plan, John Hancock Trust Company, LLC, MDU Resources Group, Inc., New York Life Trust Company. (am)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 401(k) Retirement Plan, John Hancock Trust Company, LLC, MDU Resources Group, Inc., New York Life Trust Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000510) filed by Judith Holm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holm v. MDU Resources Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Holm
Represented By: Charles L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 401(k) Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Represented By: Daniel S. Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Trust Company, LLC
Represented By: John E. Ward
Represented By: Patrick J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?