Rodriguez v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Plaintiff: Arturo Rodriguez
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00048
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have until 7/1/2020 to file an amended complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 5/18/2020. (rh)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arturo Rodriguez. (am)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MEMORANDUM in Support (Crayne, Ryan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Crayne, Ryan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Crayne, Ryan)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mail not resent to Arturo Rodriguez. Address unknown. (am)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer due by 4/16/2020. (BG) Distributed on 4/2/2020 (cjs).
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Crayne, Ryan) Modified on 4/3/2020 to remove unnecessary docket text. (js)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Financial Services International Corporation, Corporate Parent Toyota Financial Services Corporation, Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Credit Corporation.. (am)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation from Burleigh County Small Claims Court, case number 08-2020-SC-82. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number #120000582 filed by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court copies of process pleadings, orders and other documents, #3 Notice to State Court of Removal of Action)(am) Modified on 4/3/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Represented By: Ryan K. Crayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?