Weltikol v. SafeCo Insurance
Plaintiff: Luz Marina Weltikol
Defendant: SafeCo Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv00063
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/12/2020 to correct email address in order) (am). NEF regenerated on 6/12/2020 (am).
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 10/4/2021 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (4 days). (BG)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 4/1/2021. Discovery Motions due by 4/1/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/1/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/1/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 11/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 4/1/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 2/1/2021. Threshold Motions due by 1/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2021. (BG)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 6/9/2020. (BG)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 6/9/2020 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Previously set for June 1, 2020). By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Rodda on behalf of SafeCo Insurance (Rodda, Meghan)
April 27, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Answer to Complaint. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) at #5 . (cjs)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by SafeCo Insurance. (cjs)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SafeCo Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for SafeCo Insurance.. (Berglund, Daniel)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by SafeCo Insurance.(Berglund, Daniel) Modified on 4/27/2020 to restrict access (cjs).
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SafeCo Insurance from McLean County District Court, case number 28-2020-CV-00107. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000632 filed by SafeCo Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs) Modified on 4/23/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weltikol v. SafeCo Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeCo Insurance
Represented By: David S. Evinger
Represented By: Daniel W. Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Marina Weltikol
Represented By: Meggi Ihland
Represented By: David D. Schweigert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?